League of United Latin American Citizens et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: League of United Latin American Citizens, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Mi Familia Vota, American GI Forum of Texas, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, Emelda Menendez, Gilberto Menendez, Jose Olivares, Florinda Chavez and Joey Cardenas
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Consolidated Defendant: Jose A. Esparza, State of Texas, Texas Speaker Dade Phelan, Texas Lieutenant Gov Dan Patrick and John Scott
Consolidated Plaintiff: Damon James Wilson, Roy Charles Brooks, Akilah Bacy, Orlando Flores, Marilena Garza, Cecilia Gonzales, Agustin Loredo, Cinia Montoya, Ana Ramon, Jana Lynne Sanchez, Jerry Shafer, Debbie Lynn Solis, Angel Ulloa, Mary Uribe, Mexican American Legislative Caucus ("MALC"), Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Felipe Gutierrez, Phyllis Goines, Eva Bonilla, Clara Faulkner, Deborah Spell, Beverly Powell, Texas State Conference of the NAACP, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, OCA-Greater Houston, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, Emgage, Turner Khanay, Angela Rainey, Austin Ruiz, Aya Eneli, Sofia Sheikh, Jennifer Cazares, Niloufar Hafizi, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Amatulla Contractor, Deborah Chen, Arthur Resa, Sumita Ghosh, Anand Krishnaswamy, Voto Latino, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Trey Martinez Fischer
Case Number: 3:2021cv00259
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: David C Guaderrama
2 Judge: Jerry E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Return signed Certified Mail Receipt of #75 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, #70 Order,, #77 Order on Motion for Hearing to Kenneth Parreno (mc4)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Greg Abbott, John Scott, State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Proposed Scheduling Order by Akilah Bacy, Orlando Flores, Marilena Garza, Cecilia Gonzales, Voto Latino, Agustin Loredo, Cinia Montoya, Ana Ramon, Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Jana Lynne Sanchez, Jerry Shafer, Debbie Lynn Solis, Angel Ulloa, Mary Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Hicks, Max)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE 3:21-CV-00306-DCG-JES-JVB INTO LEAD CASE EP-21-CV-00259-DCG-JES-JVB. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mg2)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION TO INTERVENE BY EDDIE BERNICE JOHNSON, SHEILA JACKSON-LEE, ALEXANDER GREEN, AND JASMINE CROCKETT AS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS by League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cover letter with exhibits, #2 Proposed Order order)(Bledsoe, Gary)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #89 MOTION TO INTERVENE BY EDDIE BERNICE JOHNSON, SHEILA JACKSON-LEE, ALEXANDER GREEN, AND JASMINE CROCKETT AS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS **Remarks: NO SIGNATURE INCLUDED. PLEASE RE-FILE. (mg2)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION TO INTERVENE BY EDDIE BERNICE JOHNSON, SHEILA JACKSON-LEE, ALEXANDER GREEN, AND JASMINE CROCKETT AS PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS by League of United Latin American Citizens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cover letter with exhibits, #2 Proposed Order order)(Bledsoe, Gary)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Proposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order order, #2 Exhibit cover letter with exhibits) (Bledsoe, Gary)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #88 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Damon James Wilson, re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Wilson's Claims filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Consol Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Consol Defendant State of Texas, Defendant Greg Abbott, Consol Defendant Texas Speaker Dade Phelan, Consol Defendant Texas Lieutenant Gov Dan Patrick , Plaintiff Wilson's Response in Opposition to Defendants' FIRST Motion to Dismiss (Gladden, Richard)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Damon James Wilson.(Gladden, Richard)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Return signed Certified Mail Receipt of Text Order Granting Pro Hac Vice to Kenneth Parreno (mc4)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell, re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Brooks Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Greg Abbott (Dunn, Chad)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that for all purposes United States v. Texas, No. 3:21-CV-00299 (W.D. Tex.) is CONSOLIDATED with LULAC v. Abbott, No. 3:21-CV-00259(W.D. Tex.) under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall comply with the Court's "Order Requiring Parties to File a Proposed Scheduling Order" [ECF No. 75], filed in LULAC v. Abbott, No. 3:21-CV-00259 (W.D. Tex.). Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama and on behalf of Jerry E. Smith and Jeffrey V. Brown. (em)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss NAACP's Complaint by Greg Abbott, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Greg Abbott, John Scott, State of Texas for proceedings held on 12/07/2021. Proceedings Transcribed: Non-evidentiary status conference. Court Reporter: Kathleen Supnet. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUSS COMPLAINT, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENTMOTION, or MOTION to Strike by Greg Abbott, John Scott, State of Texas. (em)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Certified Mailing of #75 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, #70 Order,, #77 Order on Motion for Hearing, Text Orders granting Pro Hac, (em)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Certified Mailing of #75 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, #70 Order,, #77 Order on Motion for Hearing, including Text Orders granting Pro Hac, (em)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING and GRANTING #40 Motion for Hearing, except that the requested briefing schedule is DENIED. The briefing schedule was set by the Court in its December 7, 2021 Order Setting Briefing Schedule for the Brooks Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 70]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Brooks Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10 [ECF No. 39] is set for a hearing before the Three-Judge Court on 1/25/2022 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/15/2021. Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell for proceedings held on 12/07/2021. Proceedings Transcribed: Non-Evidentiary Status Conference. Court Reporter: Kathi Supnet. (Dunn, Chad)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ** DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - PLEASE SEE DOCKET ENTRY #74 **TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell for proceedings held on 12/07/2021. Proceedings Transcribed: Non-Evidentiary Status Conference. Court Reporter: Kathi Supnet. (Dunn, Chad) Modified on 12/8/2021 (bg2).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Guaderrama: Status Conference held on 12/7/2021. Panel announces that further proceedings to take place in person and not by Zoom video conference. Panel to enter scheduling order. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.)(Court Reporter Kathleen Supnet.)(em)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Memorandum in Support - Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Voto Latino, et al.'s Complaint by Greg Abbott, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion to Dismiss by Greg Abbott, John Scott, State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Dismiss)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE BROOKS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; IT IS ORDERED that the Court's "Order Granting Motion to Hold in Abeyance the Obligation to Respond to the Brooks Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction" [ECF No. 56] is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing schedule for the Brooks Plaintiffs' "Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10" [ECF No. 39] directs Defendants to FILE a response by December 20, 2021; and The Brooks Plaintiffs MAY FILE a reply by December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Abbott, John Scott amending, filed by Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, League of United Latin American Citizens, Florinda Chavez, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, Emelda Menendez, Jose Olivares, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Fiel Houston, Inc., Gilberto Menendez, Joey Cardenas, William C. Velasquez Institute, American GI Forum of Texas, La Union Del Pueblo Entero.(Perales, Nina)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arthur Resa, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Turner Khanay, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Amatulla Contractor, OCA-Greater Houston, Austin Ruiz, Angela Rainey, Emgage, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, Anand Krishnaswamy, Niloufar Hafizi, Sofia Sheikh, Aya Eneli, Sumita Ghosh as to Greg Abbott. Waiver sent on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022; John Scott. Waiver sent on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(Harris, Ashley)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Patrick Stegemoeller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15503703) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (Donatti, David)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Jerry Vattamala ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15503635) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (Donatti, David)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Susana Lorenzo-Giguere ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15503495) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (Donatti, David)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #64 Motion for Reconsideration entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Miscellaneous Objection to #63 Order AND Motion for Reconsideration , Based on Local Rule CV-7(2)(d) by Damon James Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Objection under Local Rule CV-7(2)(d))(Gladden, Richard)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff Damon Wilson's Complaint Without Prejudice, Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mt)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Motion to Certify Class and to #55 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Greg Abbott, John Scott, State of Texas. (Hudson, Eric)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric A. Hudson on behalf of Greg Abbott, John Scott, State of Texas. Attorney Eric A. Hudson added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Eric A. Hudson added to party John Scott(pty:condft), Attorney Eric A. Hudson added to party State of Texas(pty:condft) (Hudson, Eric)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andre I. Segura ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15500251) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (Segura, Andre)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Further directive incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Proposed Scheduling Order - Joint Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by Greg Abbott, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #53 Defendants Greg Abbott and John Scott's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Defendants' obligation to respond to the Brooks Plaintiffs' "Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10" (ECF No. 39) is HELD IN ABEYANCE until the Court issues a scheduling order on the preliminary injunction motion, and any other similar motions. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Certified Mailing of TEXT Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (em)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Greg Abbott, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, John Scott, re #40 MOTION for Hearing re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10 filed by Consol Plaintiff Deborah Spell, Consol Plaintiff Phyllis Goines, Consol Plaintiff Felipe Gutierrez, Consol Plaintiff Beverly Powell, Consol Plaintiff Clara Faulkner, Consol Plaintiff Roy Charles Brooks, Consol Plaintiff Eva Bonilla (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Kenneth Parreno ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15490112) by on behalf of American GI Forum of Texas, Emelda Menendez, Fiel Houston, Inc., Florinda Chavez, Gilberto Menendez, Joey Cardenas, Jose Olivares, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, League of United Latin American Citizens, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Certified Mailing of Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (em)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Certified Mailing of Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Neil Steiner, (em)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan for Brian Raphel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15487868) by on behalf of Texas State Conference of the NAACP. (Cohan, Lindsey)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan for Neil Steiner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15486026) by on behalf of Texas State Conference of the NAACP. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike, #43 MOTION to Dismiss Brooks Plaintiffs' Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: LUPE v. Abbott Transcript)(Freeman, Daniel)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Akilah Bacy, Orlando Flores, Marilena Garza, Cecilia Gonzales, Voto Latino, Agustin Loredo, Cinia Montoya, Ana Ramon, Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Jana Lynne Sanchez, Jerry Shafer, Debbie Lynn Solis, Angel Ulloa, Mary Uribe, re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Greg Abbott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of La Union v. Abbott Status Conference)(Hicks, Max)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Wilson's Claims by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, John Scott, State of Texas, Texas Lieutenant Gov Dan Patrick, Texas Speaker Dade Phelan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Brooks Plaintiffs' Claims by Greg Abbott, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, William)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas State Conference of the NAACP. John Scott served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas State Conference of the NAACP. Greg Abbott served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PLAINTIFF WILSONS VERIFIED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF CLASS ACTION re #17 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consol Plaintiff Damon James Wilson (dc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Hearing re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10 by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10 by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2-A, #5 Exhibit 2-B, #6 Exhibit 2-C, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 3-A, #9 Exhibit 3-B, #10 Exhibit 3-C, #11 Exhibit 3-D, #12 Exhibit 3-E, #13 Exhibit 3-F, #14 Exhibit 3-G, #15 Exhibit 3-H, #16 Exhibit 3-I, #17 Exhibit 3-J, #18 Exhibit 3-K, Part 1, #19 Exhibit 3-K, Part 2, #20 Exhibit 3-L, #21 Exhibit 3-M, #22 Exhibit 3-N, #23 Exhibit 4, #24 Exhibit 4-A, #25 Exhibit 5, #26 Exhibit 6, #27 Exhibit 6-A, #28 Exhibit 6-B, Part 1, #29 Exhibit 6-B, Part 2, #30 Exhibit 6-B, Part 3, #31 Exhibit 6-B, Part 4, #32 Exhibit 6-B, Part 5, #33 Exhibit 6-C, #34 Exhibit 6-D, #35 Exhibit 6-E, #36 Exhibit 6-F, #37 Exhibit 6-G, #38 Exhibit 6-H, #39 Exhibit 6-I, #40 Exhibit 6-J, #41 Exhibit 6-K, #42 Exhibit 6-L, #43 Exhibit 6-M, #44 Exhibit 7, #45 Exhibit 8, #46 Exhibit 9, #47 Exhibit 10, #48 Exhibit 11, #49 Exhibit 12, #50 Exhibit 13, #51 Exhibit 14, #52 Exhibit 15, #53 Exhibit 16, #54 Exhibit 17, #55 Exhibit 18, #56 Exhibit 19, #57 Exhibit 20, #58 Exhibit 21, #59 Exhibit 22, #60 Exhibit 23, #61 Exhibit 24, #62 Exhibit 25, #63 Exhibit 26, #64 Exhibit 27, #65 Exhibit 28, #66 Exhibit 29, #67 Exhibit 30, #68 Exhibit 31, #69 Exhibit 32, #70 Exhibit 33, #71 Exhibit 34, #72 Exhibit 35, #73 Exhibit 36, #74 Exhibit 37, #75 Exhibit 38, #76 Exhibit 39, #77 Exhibit 40, #78 Exhibit 41, #79 Exhibit 42, #80 Exhibit 43)(Dunn, Chad)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Brooks Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to Senate District 10 by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Brooks Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to SD10, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by American GI Forum of Texas, Emelda Menendez, Florinda Chavez, Gilberto Menendez, Joey Cardenas, Jose Olivares, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, League of United Latin American Citizens, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute . (Perales, Nina)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (dc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of #17 MOTION to Certify Class by Damon James Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLEADING SOUGHT TO BE FILED, #2 Proposed Order)(Gladden, Richard)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike by American GI Forum of Texas, Emelda Menendez, Fiel Houston, Inc., Florinda Chavez, Gilberto Menendez, Joey Cardenas, Jose Olivares, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, League of United Latin American Citizens, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #35 Plaintiff Wilson's "Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Verified Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Certification of Class, In Excess of Page Limitation" entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #38 the Brooks Plaintiffs' "Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Preliminary Injunction Motion." Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Hilary Harris Klein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15470427) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (Donatti, David)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING, ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/7/2021 09:00 AM before the Three-Judge Court, Courtroom 812, 8th Floor of the United States Courthouse). The Parties shall jointly File with the Court a proposed agenda for the status conference by 12/2/21.. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING #19 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Mitchell Brown ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15454419) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Noor Taj( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15447046) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Donatti on behalf of Allison Riggs ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15447027) by on behalf of Amatulla Contractor, Jennifer Cazares, Deborah Chen, Emgage, Aya Eneli, Fair Maps Texas Action Committee, Sumita Ghosh, Niloufar Hafizi, Turner Khanay, Anand Krishnaswamy, North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association, OCA-Greater Houston, Angela Rainey, Lakshmi Ramakrishnan, Arthur Resa, Austin Ruiz, Sofia Sheikh. (mc4) Modified on 11/22/2021 (mc4).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan for Sofia Fernandez Gold ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15454148) by on behalf of Texas State Conference of the NAACP. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan for Pooja Chaudhuri ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15454125) by on behalf of Texas State Conference of the NAACP. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan for Jon Greenbaum ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-154541107) by on behalf of Texas State Conference of the NAACP. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan for Ezra Rosenberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15454016) by on behalf of Texas State Conference of the NAACP. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, John Scott, re #19 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Consol Plaintiff Cecilia Gonzales, Consol Plaintiff Jana Lynne Sanchez, Consol Plaintiff Ana Ramon, Consol Plaintiff Agustin Loredo, Consol Plaintiff Akilah Bacy, Counter Plaintiff Voto Latino, Consol Plaintiff Marilena Garza, Consol Plaintiff Orlando Flores, Consol Plaintiff Cinia Montoya, Consol Plaintiff Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Consol Plaintiff Angel Ulloa, Consol Plaintiff Jerry Shafer, Consol Plaintiff Mary Uribe, Consol Plaintiff Debbie Lynn Solis (Sweeten, Patrick) (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Greg Abbott, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick) (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response, including their arguments in reply, by 2:00 p.m. tomorrow, November 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Akilah Bacy, Orlando Flores, Marilena Garza, Cecilia Gonzales, Voto Latino, Agustin Loredo, Cinia Montoya, Ana Ramon, Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Jana Lynne Sanchez, Jerry Shafer, Debbie Lynn Solis, Angel Ulloa, Mary Uribe Regarding Pending Motion to Consolidate (Exhibit #1 Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Consolidate)(Hicks, Max). (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order Appointing Three Judge Panel, and Remand to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas by Akilah Bacy, Orlando Flores, Marilena Garza, Cecilia Gonzales, Voto Latino, Agustin Loredo, Cinia Montoya, Ana Ramon, Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Jana Lynne Sanchez, Jerry Shafer, Debbie Lynn Solis, Angel Ulloa, Mary Uribe. (Hicks, Max) (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Certify Class by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, State of Texas, Texas Lieutenant Gov Dan Patrick, Texas Speaker Dade Phelan. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Certify Class ( Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Class Action) by Damon James Wilson. (mc4)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases; IT FURTHER ORDERED that the above-styled cases are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). The three-judge panel is Judges David C. Guaderrama, Jerry E. Smith, and Jeffrey V. Brown. The lead case is LULAC v. Abbott,No. 3:21-CV-00259 (W.D. Tex.) and the consolidated cases are 1:21-cv-943-RP-JES-JVB, 1:21-cv-965-RP-JES-JVB, 1:21-CV-988-RP-JES-JVB, 1:21-cv-991-RP-JES-JVB, 1:21-CV-1006-RP-JES-JVB, and 1:21-CV-1038-RP-JES-JVB, (i.e., the first-filed case). All future pleadings, motions, or other documents should be filed under that cause number. Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Mexican American Legislative Caucus ("MALC"), re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott (McCaffity, Sean)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Voto Latino, Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara, Akilah Bacy, Orlando Flores, Marilena Garza, Cecilia Gonzales, Agustin Loredo, Cinia Montoya, Ana Ramon, Jana Lynne Sanchez, Jerry Shafer, Debbie Lynn Solis, Angel Ulloa, Mary Uribe, re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott to Consolidate (Hicks, Max)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Brooks Plaintiffs, re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott (Dunn, Chad)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Dismiss for a more definite statement, or MOTION to Strike by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (em)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motion to Dismiss, for a More Definite Statement, or to Strike by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, for a More Definite Statement, or to Strike, #2 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Damon James Wilson, re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gladden, Richard)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Plaintiffs in this action to file their response toDefendant's "Partially Opposed Motion to Consolidate" (ECF No. 7) by November 15, 2021. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Jose A. Esparza(pty:dft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Denying Consolidation (Gutierrez v. Abbott), #2 Exhibit Original Complaint (Morris v. Texas), #3 Exhibit Original Complaint (Gutierrez v. Abbott), #4 Exhibit Original Complaint (Wilson v. Texas), #5 Exhibit Original Complaint (Voto Latino v. Scott), #6 Exhibit Original Complaint (MALC v. Texas), #7 Exhibit Original Complaint (Brooks v. Abbott), #8 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emelda Menendez, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, League of United Latin American Citizens, Jose Olivares, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Fiel Houston, Inc., Gilberto Menendez, Florinda Chavez, Joey Cardenas, William C. Velasquez Institute, American GI Forum of Texas, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, La Union Del Pueblo Entero. Jose A. Esparza served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Perales, Nina)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emelda Menendez, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, League of United Latin American Citizens, Jose Olivares, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Fiel Houston, Inc., Gilberto Menendez, Florinda Chavez, Joey Cardenas, William C. Velasquez Institute, American GI Forum of Texas, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, La Union Del Pueblo Entero. Greg Abbott served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Perales, Nina)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (em)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER appointing three judge panel to Judge Jerry E. Smith, Judge David C. Guaderramaand Judge Jeffrey V. Brown. Signed by Judge Priscilla R. Owen. (em)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American GI Forum of Texas, Emelda Menendez, Fiel Houston, Inc., Florinda Chavez, Gilberto Menendez, Joey Cardenas, Jose Olivares, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, League of United Latin American Citizens, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15344799). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Emelda Menendez, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, League of United Latin American Citizens, Jose Olivares, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Fiel Houston, Inc., Gilberto Menendez, Florinda Chavez, Joey Cardenas, William C. Velasquez Institute, American GI Forum of Texas, Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents, La Union Del Pueblo Entero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perales, Nina)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (em)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso. (em)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of United Latin American Citizens et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Gary L. Bledsoe
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Familia Vota
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American GI Forum of Texas
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Union Del Pueblo Entero
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mexican American Bar Association of Texas
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Velasquez Institute
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiel Houston, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Association of Latino Administrators and Superintendents
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emelda Menendez
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Menendez
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Olivares
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florinda Chavez
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Cardenas
Represented By: Samantha T. Serna
Represented By: Nina Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jose A. Esparza
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Texas Speaker Dade Phelan
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Texas Lieutenant Gov Dan Patrick
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Scott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Damon James Wilson
Represented By: Richard Scott Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roy Charles Brooks
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Akilah Bacy
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Orlando Flores
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marilena Garza
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cecilia Gonzales
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Agustin Loredo
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cinia Montoya
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ana Ramon
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jana Lynne Sanchez
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jerry Shafer
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Debbie Lynn Solis
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angel Ulloa
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mary Uribe
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mexican American Legislative Caucus ("MALC")
Represented By: George (Tex) Quesada
Represented By: Sean J. McCaffity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rosalinda Ramos Abuabara
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Felipe Gutierrez
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Phyllis Goines
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eva Bonilla
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Clara Faulkner
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Deborah Spell
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Beverly Powell
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Texas State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Brian Raphel
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Represented By: Neil Steiner
Represented By: Pooja Chaudhuri
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Fair Maps Texas Action Committee
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: OCA-Greater Houston
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: North Texas Chapter of the Asian Pacific Islander American Public Affairs Association
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Emgage
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Turner Khanay
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angela Rainey
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Austin Ruiz
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Aya Eneli
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sofia Sheikh
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jennifer Cazares
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Niloufar Hafizi
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lakshmi Ramakrishnan
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Amatulla Contractor
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Deborah Chen
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Arthur Resa
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sumita Ghosh
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Anand Krishnaswamy
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Represented By: Hilary Harris Klein
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Represented By: Mitchell Brown
Represented By: Noor Taj
Represented By: Patrick Stegemoeller
Represented By: Susana Lorenzo-Giguere
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Voto Latino
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Max Renea Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Freeman
Represented By: Holly Frances Balsley Berlin
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Jasmin Camille Lott
Represented By: Jaye Allison Sitton
Represented By: Michelle Christine Rupp
Represented By: Thomas Christian Herren, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy F. Mellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Trey Martinez Fischer
Represented By: Martin Anthony Golando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?