Taylor v. Rudolph Chevrolet LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Taylor
Defendant: Rudolph Chevrolet LLC and Santander Consumer USA
Case Number: 3:2023cv00077
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Filing 31 Affidavit for Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Samuel Taylor (ep1)
April 17, 2023 Filing 30 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rudolph Chevrolet LLC. (Mann, John)
April 17, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Rudolph Chevrolet LLC.(Mann, John)
April 10, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing (Interrogatories as to Santander Consumer USA) by Samuel Taylor (Attachments: #1 Correspondence)(ep1)
April 10, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing (Interrogatories as to Rudolph Chevrolet LLC) by Samuel Taylor (Attachments: #1 Correspondence)(ep1)
April 4, 2023 Filing 26 Certified Mail Receipt of #15 Order (ep1)
April 3, 2023 Filing 25 Certified Mailing of #24 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement (ep1)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER MOOTING #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall RESPOND to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, ECF No. 12, on or before April 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
April 3, 2023 Filing 23 Cover Letter for the Correction of Error on the Proposed Judgement Submitted 3/31/2023 from Samuel Taylor. (ep1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (ep1).
April 3, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel Taylor (ep1)
April 3, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel Taylor (ep1)
March 31, 2023 Filing 20 QUESTIONNAIRE from Samuel Taylor. (ep1)
March 31, 2023 Filing 19 Exhibit List by Samuel Taylor.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(ep1)
March 31, 2023 Filing 18 Cover Letter for Exhibits and Evidence Submitted on 3/31/2023 from Samuel Taylor. (ep1)
March 31, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Samuel Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ep1)
March 31, 2023 Filing 16 Certified Mailing of #15 Order (ep1)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Plaintiff to COMPLETE the attached Questionnaire. Plaintiff shall FILE his answers to the Questionnaire on or before April 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
March 30, 2023 Filing 14 Public Notice of Entry and Special Appearance by Samuel Taylor (ep1)
March 30, 2023 Filing 13 Plaintiff's written notice to Court's order filed 3/17/2023 #9 Order by Samuel Taylor. (ep1)
March 24, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Samuel Taylor.(ep1)
March 23, 2023 Filing 11 Certified Mail Receipt of #10 Certified Mailing (ep1)
March 20, 2023 Filing 10 Certified Mailing of #9 Order (dt)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Plaintiff to FILE a written notice on or before March 31, 2023, to facilitate the Courts determination of whether subject matter jurisdiction lies in this matter. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
March 16, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 Order by Samuel Taylor. (ep1)
March 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Rudolph Chevrolet LLC. (Mann, John)
March 9, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #1 Complaint by Samuel Taylor. (ep1)
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 Certified Mailing of #4 Order (ep1)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to submit written notice identifying the citizenship of each party to this proceeding on or before March 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
February 22, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Taylor. Rudolph Chevrolet LLC served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023; Santander Consumer USA served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (ep1)
February 22, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rudolph Chevrolet LLC, Santander Consumer USA. (ep1)
February 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 934), filed by Samuel Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Reciept)(ep1) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Rudolph Chevrolet LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Chevrolet LLC
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?