Bustillos v. Kumar et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Cano Bustillos
Defendant: Shiv Kumar, Prince Freight Carrier, Inc., Atlas Logistics Services, Inc. and Alpha Logistics Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00425
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alpha Logistics Services, Inc., Shiv Kumar, Prince Freight Carrier, Inc. amending, filed by Nancy Cano Bustillos.(dt)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
January 11, 2024 Filing 15 Exhibit List Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Nancy Cano Bustillos.. (Labinoti, Daniela)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Nancy Cano Bustillos. (Labinoti, Daniela)
January 11, 2024 Filing 13 Witness List by Nancy Cano Bustillos. (Labinoti, Daniela)
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Cano Bustillos Plaintiff's Certificate of Service (Labinoti, Daniela)
January 10, 2024 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Nancy Cano Bustillos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Labinoti, Daniela)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Daniel H. Hernandez added to party Prince Freight Carrier, Inc.(pty:dft) by Prince Freight Carrier, Inc..(Hernandez, Daniel)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 12/13/2024 08:30AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,, Jury Trial set for 12/13/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,, Status Conference set for 12/5/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 8/2/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2024, Discovery due by 7/2/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2024, Motions due by 8/2/2024,. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Shiv Kumar. (Hernandez, Daniel)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Cano Bustillos. Atlas Logistics Services, Inc. served on 10/28/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Labinoti, Daniela)
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Cano Bustillos. Prince Freight Carrier, Inc. served on 10/28/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Labinoti, Daniela)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Shiv Kumar. (dt)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to File. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Shiv Kumar's Answer by Shiv Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs' Supplemental Answer)(Hernandez, Daniel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Amended Certificate of Service by Shiv Kumar (Hernandez, Daniel)
November 20, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dt)
November 20, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (dt)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shiv Kumar (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-18118665), filed by Shiv Kumar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplement)(Hernandez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bustillos v. Kumar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Cano Bustillos
Represented By: Daniela Labinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiv Kumar
Represented By: Daniel H. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Freight Carrier, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel H. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Logistics Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Logistics Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?