Hemphill v. City of Monahans et al
Plaintiff: Eric Hemphill
Defendant: Monahans Police Department, William Riley - Chief of Police (in his individual and official capacity), Ward County, Texas, Sheriff Mikel Strikland (in his official and individual capacity), City of Monahans, Ward County Sheriffs Department, Mikel Strikland and William Riley
Case Number: 4:2018cv00044
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mikel Strikland, Ward County Sheriffs Department, Ward County, Texas. (Hogg, Jon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by City of Monahans, Monahans Police Department, William Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Hamm, Melinda)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Hemphill. William Riley served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cloutman, Edward)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Hemphill. Monahans Police Department served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cloutman, Edward)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Hemphill. City of Monahans served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cloutman, Edward)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Hemphill. Mikel Strikland served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cloutman, Edward)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Hemphill. Ward County Sheriffs Department served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cloutman, Edward)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Hemphill. Ward County, Texas served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cloutman, Edward)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ward County, Texas. (mb1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ward County Sheriffs Department. (mb1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mikel Strikland. (mb1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monahans Police Department. (mb1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Monahans. (mb1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Riley. (mb1)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Eric Hemphill. (Cloutman, Edward)
September 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mb1)
September 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (mb1)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Original ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11246552), filed by Eric Hemphill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenfield, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemphill v. City of Monahans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monahans Police Department
Represented By: Melinda D. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Riley - Chief of Police (in his individual and official capacity)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County, Texas
Represented By: Jon Mark Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Mikel Strikland (in his official and individual capacity)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monahans
Represented By: Melinda D. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward County Sheriffs Department
Represented By: Jon Mark Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikel Strikland
Represented By: Jon Mark Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Riley
Represented By: Melinda D. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hemphill
Represented By: Adam S. Greenfield
Represented By: Edward B. Cloutman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?