UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALBAGMI et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Faheed Albagmi, David Knox, Alvin Olson, Manuel Avila and Eberth Corrales
Case Number: 4:2019cv00002
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alvin Olson answer due 5/2/2019. (ab1)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All answers must be filed on or before May 2, 2019. Entered by Judge David B. Fannin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DF)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Hanson, Robyn)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of Alvin Olson. Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Alvin Olson(pty:dft) (Cabello, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to Faheed Albagmi. Waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Manuel Avila. Waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Eberth Corrales. Waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; David Knox. Waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Alvin Olson. Waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Hanson, Robyn)
January 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (mb1)
January 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mb1)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed. No Summons requested at this time, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, Robyn) Modified on 1/15/2019 (mb1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALBAGMI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robyn E. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faheed Albagmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Olson
Represented By: J. David Cabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eberth Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?