Brandenburg v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Matthew Brandenburg
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv00055
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge David B. Fannin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bz)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Matthews, Melissa)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Joint Status Report due to the Court within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that Ms. Helm, if she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). entered by Judge David B. Fannin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bz)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Dorman Matthews for Elizabeth C. Helm ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12706612) by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Matthews, Melissa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Letter for Richard B. North to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (ab1)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letter for Jose Tomas Ballesteros to Kristen Matthew Brandenburg. (ab1)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter Christopher Kyle Johnson for Kristen Matthew Brandenburg. (ab1)
September 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
September 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Matthews, Melissa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00598.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-00598-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15195706 filed by Kristen Matthew Brandenburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandenburg v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Matthew Brandenburg
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Represented By: Jose Tomas Ballesteros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?