Gonzales-Trevino v. Rigsby
Plaintiff: Leonel Alberto Gonzales-Trevino
Defendant: Vincent Rigsby
Case Number: 4:2019cv00069
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING DOC. #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply up to and including February 3, 2020, to produce IFP form or pay the $5.00 filing fee, and to submit the proper form, entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Leonel Alberto Gonzales-Trevino.. Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner shall either file an Application toProceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the $5.00 filing fee within twenty (20) days of the entry of this Order due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Submit Motion on Proper Form. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by Leonel Alberto Gonzales-Trevino.(ab1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Envelope) (ab1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales-Trevino v. Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Alberto Gonzales-Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?