Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC et al v. Petro Guardian, LLC
Plaintiff: Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC and Waterbridge Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Petro Guardian, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00034
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: David B Fannin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Waterbridge Holdings, LLC, Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC, re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiff Waterbridge Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jett, M.)
October 20, 2023 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Petro Guardian, LLC, re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiff Waterbridge Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Buechler, Daniel)
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Petro Guardian, LLC. (Buechler, Daniel)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Non-Consent by Petro Guardian, LLC re #8 Order (Buechler, Daniel)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Petro Guardian LLC. (ab1)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER and ADVISORY, the parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendant Petro Guardian LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Original Answer is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Defendant's Answer attached to the instant motion. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge David B. Fannin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Original Answer by Petro Guardian, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Buechler, Daniel)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Strike by Waterbridge Holdings, LLC, Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Jett, M.)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing as to Petro Guardian, LLC. Show Cause Response due by Friday, 10/20/2023 why Judgment on Plaintiff's compliant should not be granted. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
September 21, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Certificate of Service by Petro Guardian, LLC. (Buechler, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Waterbridge Holdings, LLC, Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC. (ab1)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Petro Guardian, LLC. (Buechler, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Petro Guardian, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17887375), filed by Petro Guardian, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 1, #2 Supplement Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 index of state documents, #4 Exhibit 4 docket and exhibits, #5 Exhibit 5 affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 state court removal notice)(Buechler, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
September 15, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC et al v. Petro Guardian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterbridge Texas Operating, LLC
Represented By: M. Matt Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterbridge Holdings, LLC
Represented By: M. Matt Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Guardian, LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. Cord, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Paul Buechler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?