Walding et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: David Walding, Giovany Alexander Cuaresma, Marlon Valladares, Eliazar Rivera, E.A.F.F., D.A.E.F. and E.R.J.
Defendant: United States of America, Belinda Leal, Jane Doe, Efraen Garcia, Maggie Gaytan, James Roe, Sara Moe, Away From Home, Inc., Jose Gonzalez, James De La Cruz, Jose Mungia, Martha E. Newton, Maureen Dunn, Susana Ortiz-Ang, James Orr, Marc Moore, Carey Cockerell, Dianna Spiser and Joyce James
Case Number: 5:2008cv00124
Filed: February 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER re 356 Bill of Costs, filed by James Orr, Martha E. Newton, Susana Ortiz-Ang, United States of America, Marc Moore, Jose Gonzalez, James De La Cruz, Maureen Dunn, Jose Mungia. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER - Defendants shall file supplemental briefing no later than May 8, 2014. re 362 Supplement filed by James Orr, Martha E. Newton, Susana Ortiz-Ang, United States of America, Marc Moore, Tsegaye Wolde, Jose Gonzalez, James De La Cruz, Maureen Dunn, Jose Mungia. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER re 64 Granting Motion to Dismiss & Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jose Gonzalez, James De La Cruz, Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) Modified on 7/5/2013 (wg).
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER DENYING IN PART 345 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Replies; GRANTING 274 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff E.H.C.'s Retaliation Claim by Maureen Dunn and James De La Cruz's. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 155 Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Cause of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 94 Report and Recommendations, is accepted in part and rejected in part. The United States' motion to dismiss and motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, and DISMISSED IN PART. Plaintiff's shall file their proposed discovery with the Court no later than 4/6/2009 and Defendants shall file any objections to the proposed discovery no later than 4/9/2009. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 93 Report and Recommendations, and will GRANT IN PART and DENY IN PART the Individual Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 63 and will DISMISS AS MOOT the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 92 Report and Recommendations, and GRANTS the State Defendants' motion to dismiss 59 . All claims against Defendants Cockrell, Spiser, and James are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walding et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walding
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovany Alexander Cuaresma
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Valladares
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliazar Rivera
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A.F.F.
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.A.E.F.
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R.J.
Represented By: Stephanie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efraen Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Gaytan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Moe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Away From Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mungia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha E. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Ortiz-Ang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Cockerell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Spiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?