Perez et al v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Harold Dutton, Jr., Shannon Perez and Gregory Tamez
Defendant: Hope Andrade, David Dewhurst, Rick Perry, State of Texas and Joe Straus
Case Number: 5:2011cv00360
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Jerry E. Smith
Referring Judge: Orlando L. Garcia
2 Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1632 ORDER, the various requests for discretionary relief under § 3(c) are hereby denied. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1540 ORDER on Plan H358. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Chief Judge Orlando Garcia and Circuit Judge Jerry E. Smith. (aej) Modified on 8/24/2017 to include all judges (aej).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1535 ORDER on Plan C235. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Chief Judge Orlando Garcia and Circuit Judge Jerry E. Smith. (aej)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 AMENDED ORDER on Plan C185. Signed by Judge Jerry E. Smith dissenting. (aej)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 996 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia and Judge Jerry E. Smith (aej)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER on Plan H283. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Plan C185 claims. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez and Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. Circuit Judge Smith dissenting.
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 ORDER DENYING 1319 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Implementation of 2013 Redistricting Plans for 2016 Election Cycle. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Judge Jerry E. Smith and Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 AMENDED ORDER re 1133 GRANTING Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Present Testimony Prior to Opening Statements filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 1107 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 995 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss the 2011 plan claims as moot is DENIED and the motion to dismiss the political gerrymandering claims against the 2013 plan claims is GRANTED. Accordingly, all claims asserted by TDP and Morris are DISMISSED. The Court expresses no view on the ultimate merits or chances of success of the claims that remain for decision. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Circuit Judge Jerry E. Smith, Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) Modified on 6/17/2014 to include all Judges (aej).
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 1012 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 1024 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER DENYING 991 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 976 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER DENYING 930 Motion to Modify Order regarding legislative privilege. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Circuit Judge Jerry E. Smith, Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER GRANTING 871 United States' Motion to Intervene Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia and Judge Xavier Rodriguez. United States Circuit Judge Jerry E. Smith, dissenting. (kh)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Latino Task Force plaintiffs opposed motion for reconsideration of portion of order on supplementation of record (Dkt. # 834 ). The Perez plaintiffs filed a memorandum in support of the Latino Task Forces mot ion (Dkt. # 837 ). Defendants filed a response (Dkt. # 849 ), and Plaintiffs filed a joint reply (Dkt. # 870 ). The Court has considered the legal arguments of counsel, and finds that Plaintiffs motion should be DENIED without prejudice to reurging same if any witnesses are unavailable to testify in person. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia (on behalf of the three judge panel) (kh)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER GRANTING 708 Motion to Expedite. The panel will conduct a hearing at 1:30 p.m. on Friday, August 31, 2012 in Courtroom 2. Any party objecting to this conference or the time and date shall file an objection by 2:30 today. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (kh, )
November 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER DENYING 529 Opposed MOTION to Stay Implementation of Interim House Redistricting Plan filed by Hope Andrade, State of Texas, Rick Perry.Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Circuit Judge Jerry E. Smith, Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mo,)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER GRANTING 306 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Norfleet W. Rives. The Motion to Exclude is hereby withdrawn 300 . Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (tm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dewhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Dutton, Jr.
Represented By: Gray & Becker, P.C.
Represented By: David R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Perez
Represented By: Gray & Becker, P.C.
Represented By: David R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Tamez
Represented By: David R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?