Amaya v. City of San Antonio
Plaintiff: Joseph Amaya
Defendant: City of San Antonio
Case Number: 5:2012cv00574
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1437 Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 53 Motion to exclude Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART 52 MOTION to Dismiss, ( Motions due by 9/3/2014,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; GRANTING [] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amaya v. City of San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Amaya
Represented By: Edward L. Bravenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?