U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. v. SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro and Val Verde Investments, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Jack Gunther, President Bruce Gates, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, Christopher Dedmon and SDC Montana, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv01231
Filed: December 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2016 Filing 222 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Dismissing #218 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Notice of Appeal,, filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter from USCA)(fs)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING #219 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ac)
June 27, 2016 Filing 220 NOTICE of No Opposition to Motion for Withdrawal by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Robertson, Benjamin)
May 16, 2016 Filing 219 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
May 2, 2016 NOTICE OF APPEAL following #218 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number #0542-8439751. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (rf)
May 2, 2016 Filing 218 Appeal of Final Judgment #211 , #150 , #142 , #193 , #189 by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-8439751) (Taillieu, Olivier)
April 6, 2016 Filing 217 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (rf)
April 1, 2016 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE FILE DATE OF THESE ENTRIES HAVE BEEN CORRECTED TO REFLECT 3/31/16**** re #214 Jury Note 1(Sealed), #213 Jury Note 2(Sealed). (rf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 216 JURY NOTE 4 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (rf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 215 JURY NOTE 3 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (rf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 214 JURY NOTE 2 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (rf) Modified on 4/1/2016, to correct file date (rf).
March 31, 2016 Filing 213 JURY NOTE 1 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (rf) Modified on 4/1/2016 , to correct file date (rf).
March 31, 2016 Filing 212 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial completed on 3/31/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(rf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 211 JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Enercorp against SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, Val Verde Investments, and Ringo Shapiro.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ac)
March 31, 2016 Filing 210 JURY VERDICT (Redacted Version) for U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. filed. Unredacted Jury Verdict Sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002..(rf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 209 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/30/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(rf)
March 30, 2016 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (rf)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER DENYING #203 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; DENYING ORAL Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rf)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER the jury is sequestered during deliberations. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rf)
March 30, 2016 Filing 206 Court's Instructions to Jury. (rf)
March 30, 2016 Filing 205 Miscellaneous Objection to Verdict Form by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 29, 2016 Filing 204 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/29/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers & Chris Poage.)(rf)
March 29, 2016 Filing 203 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 28, 2016 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/28/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(rf)
March 28, 2016 Filing 201 Proposed Jury Instructions by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Gewirtz, Maura)
March 28, 2016 Filing 200 Proposed Jury Instructions by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Gewirtz, Maura)
March 28, 2016 Filing 199 Proposed Jury Instructions by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 27, 2016 Filing 198 Miscellaneous Objection TO DEFENDANTS' TARDY DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS OF STEVEN FOWLER by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO TARDY FOWLER DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS)(Robertson, Benjamin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 197 Pretrial Disclosures Deposition Designations of Steven Fowler by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Gewirtz, Maura)
March 24, 2016 Filing 196 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/24/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(rf)
March 23, 2016 Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/23/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers & Chris Poage.)(rf)
March 22, 2016 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/22/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers & Chris Poage.)(rf)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF U.S. ENERCORP, LTD.'S OBJECTIONSTO DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS re #187 Notice of Filing filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rf)
March 21, 2016 Filing 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial held on 3/21/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(rf)
March 20, 2016 Filing 191 Miscellaneous Objection TO DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER SUSTAINING OBJECTIONS)(Robertson, Benjamin)
March 18, 2016 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Jury Trial begun on 3/18/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(rf)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE: #175 MOTION in Limine filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.,. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (sf)
March 17, 2016 Filing 188 Proposed Pretrial Order ON PLAINTIFF U.S. ENERCORP, LTD.S MOTION IN LIMINE by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 17, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC (Taillieu, Olivier)
March 15, 2016 Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION TO ALLOW JURY NOTE TAKING by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Allowing Note Taking)(Robertson, Benjamin)
March 15, 2016 Filing 185 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR TRIAL by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 15, 2016 Filing 184 Witness List by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
March 11, 2016 Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counter-Claims for Lack of Capacity by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Motion to Dismiss)(Robertson, Benjamin)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re #181 Notice filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rf)
March 7, 2016 Filing 181 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Brief by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC re #180 Order on Motion to Continue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Taillieu, Olivier)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING #179 Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ac)
February 29, 2016 Filing 179 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER DENYING #177 JOINT EMERGENCY Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
February 24, 2016 Filing 177 Agreed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER SETTING JURY SELECTION/TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES)(Robertson, Benjamin) Modified on 2/24/2016, to add filers (rf).
February 24, 2016 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, and Ringo Shapiro" HAVE BEEN ADDED AS FILERS OF THIS DOCUMENT**** re #177 Agreed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting. (rf)
February 12, 2016 Filing 176 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #175 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Taillieu, Olivier)
February 8, 2016 Filing 175 MOTION in Limine by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth for all proceedings. Judge David A. Ezra no longer assigned to case, ( Jury Selection reset for 3/18/2016 8:30AM before Judge Royce C. Lamberth,, Jury Trial reset for 3/18/2016 08:30 AM before Judge Royce C. Lamberth,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RESETTING: Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/25/2016 at 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, Jury Selection and Jury Trial RESET for 2/29/2016 at 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (sf)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #172 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maura Gewirtz. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tr1)
October 26, 2015 Filing 172 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Olivier A. Taillieu Motion of Maura Gewirtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7903691) by on behalf of SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
October 26, 2015 Filing 171 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #166 MOTION to Strike by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 23, 2015 Filing 168 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THIS DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - Proposed order required. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order usingthe (Attachment) event from menu and link the proposed order to this document. See page 10, item 9d of theAdministrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas.**** re #164 MOTION to Strike (rf)
October 22, 2015 Filing 170 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***ADVISE COUNSEL PROPOSED ORDER IS REQUIRED. DO NOT re-file entire document, ONLY Proposed Order *** RE: #166 MOTION to Strike and Objectons (sf)
October 22, 2015 Filing 169 -DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***ADVISED COUNSEL PROPOSED ORDER IS REQUIRED - DO NOT re-file entire document, ONLY re-file Proposed Order*** RE: #165 MOTION to Strike and Objections (sf)
October 22, 2015 Filing 167 Witness List by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 22, 2015 Filing 166 Motion to Strike and Objection to #158 Proposed Jury Instructions by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier) Modified on 10/23/2015 to edit event to reflect as a motion and indicate deficiency(sf).
October 22, 2015 Filing 165 Motion to Strike and Objection to #162 Exhibit List by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin) Modified on 10/23/2015 to edit event to reflect as a motion and indicate Deficiency(sf)
October 22, 2015 Filing 164 MOTION to Strike and Objection to #163 Proposed Jury Instructions by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin) Modified on 10/23/2015, to designate deficiency (rf).
October 20, 2015 Filing 163 Proposed Jury Instructions by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 20, 2015 Filing 162 Exhibit List by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC.. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 20, 2015 Filing 161 Witness List by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 20, 2015 Filing 160 Proposed Voir Dire by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 20, 2015 Filing 159 STATEMENT OF ISSUES Shapiro, et al.'s Statement of Claims and Defenses by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
October 20, 2015 Filing 158 Proposed Jury Instructions by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 157 STATEMENT OF ISSUES U.S. Enercorp, LTd.'s Statement of Claims and Defenses by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 156 Exhibit List U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.'s Exhibit List by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd... (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 155 Proposed Voir Dire by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 154 Witness List by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 153 Witness List by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 152 STIPULATION Stipulated Facts by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Robertson, Benjamin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE Joint Trial Estimate by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Robertson, Benjamin)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING #117 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Robert D. Pulliam. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Cancelling Daubert Hearing. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (sf)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER, ( Daubert Hearing set for 10/8/2015 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 FIRST AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE,JURY SELECTION/TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES, ( Jury Selection set for 11/16/2015 9:30AM before Judge David A. Ezra,, Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 9:30 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,, Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2015 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,),. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
July 17, 2015 Filing 146 Agreed MOTION to Continue Trial Setting by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Order Setting Final Pretrial Conference, Jury Selection/Trial and Related Deadlines)(Robertson, Benjamin)
July 14, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Robertson (Robertson, Benjamin)
June 24, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE of Change of Address by Olivier A. Taillieu (Taillieu, Olivier)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2015 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, Jury Selection set for 9/28/2015 9:30AM before Judge David A. Ezra, Jury Trial set for 9/28/2015 9:30 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DENYING #88 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING AS MOOT #92 Motion to Amend/Correct; GRANTING #134 Sealed Motion Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
March 11, 2015 Filing 141 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC amending #13 Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd..(rf)
March 11, 2015 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2015 re #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, #134 Sealed Motion filed filed by Bruce Gates, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristin Anderson.)(rf)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER GRANTING #110 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
March 11, 2015 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #134 Sealed Motion filed (rf)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #134 Sealed Motion filed, #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 10:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
February 6, 2015 Filing 138 Sealed Document (Reply in Support of First Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by U.S. Enercorp, LTD. and Bruce C. Gates (rf) Modified docket text on 2/9/2015 (tr1).
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #137 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pkc)
February 4, 2015 Filing 137 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (Davis, Amy)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING #119 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 AMENDED ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #134 Sealed Motion filed, #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2015 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
January 28, 2015 Filing 134 Sealed Motion (Partial Motion for Summary Judgment) filed (rf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2015: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Proposed Order) (rf). Modified on 1/28/2015, per chambers (rf).
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #133 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Deadline to file Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (now filed as Dkt no. 134) is extended to February 4, 2015. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tr1)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #127 Sealed Motion entered by Judge David A. Ezra. The clerk is directed to file the attached motion for partial summary judgment under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pkc)
January 27, 2015 Filing 133 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy) Modified on 1/28/2015 to link to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt no. 134) (tr1).
January 26, 2015 Filing 132 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadline for U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. and Bruce Gates to File Their Reply in Support of Their Proposed First Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Bruce Gates, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
January 22, 2015 Filing 131 Sealed Document (Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde in Vestments, LLC, and Ringo Shapiro's (rf) Modified on 1/28/2015 to link to correct motion Dkt no. 134 and to add additional docket description (tr1). Modified on 1/28/2015 (tr1).
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #130 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pkc)
January 21, 2015 Filing 130 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Brief Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (Taillieu, Olivier)
January 14, 2015 Filing 129 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Bruce Gates, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier) Modified on 1/14/2015, to add filers (rf).
January 14, 2015 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "Bruce Gates and U.S. Enercorp, Ltd" HAVE BEEN ADDED AS FILERS OF THIS DOCUMENT****re #129 Stipulation,. (rf)
January 10, 2015 Motion Hearing: #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2015 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, (rf)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #128 Motion to Reset January 21, 2015 Motions Hearing. Motions Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is RESET for 2/26/2015 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra in Courtroom 5. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tr1)
January 8, 2015 Filing 128 MOTION to Reset January 21, 2015 Hearing re #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Bruce Gates, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Corey F. Wehmeyer, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
January 7, 2015 Filing 127 Sealed Motion filed (rf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2015: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Proposed Order) (rf).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #126 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pkc)
January 5, 2015 Filing 126 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document, #7 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Document, #10 Sealed Document, #11 Sealed Document, #12 Sealed Document, #13 Sealed Document, #14 Sealed Document, #15 Sealed Document, #16 Sealed Document, #17 Sealed Document, #18 Sealed Document, #19 Sealed Document, #20 Sealed Document, #21 Sealed Document, #22 Sealed Document) (Davis, Amy)
December 29, 2014 Filing 125 ATTORNEY'S NOTICE of Change of Address by Olivier A. Taillieu (rf)
December 18, 2014 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Support, filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., re #119 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.'s Supplement to the Summary Judgment Evidence in Support of its Response to SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, and Ringo Shapiro's Motion filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Davis, Amy)
December 16, 2014 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., re #117 Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Wehmeyer, Corey)
December 11, 2014 Filing 122 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #119 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.'s Supplement to the Summary Judgment Evidence in Support of its Response to SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, and Ringo Shapiro's Motion filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Taillieu, Olivier)
December 9, 2014 Filing 121 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #117 Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Taillieu, Olivier)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2015 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
December 4, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.'s Supplement to the Summary Judgment Evidence in Support of its Response to SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, and Ringo Shapiro's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
December 4, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE of Change of Address by Olivier A. Taillieu (Taillieu, Olivier)
December 2, 2014 Filing 117 Sealed Motion (Opposed Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Designated Expert Witness- Robert D. Pulliam) filed (rf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2014: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Proposed Order) (rf). Modified on 12/2/2014, to edit text (rf). Modified docket text on 1/28/2015 to add additional description (tr1).
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #116 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pkc)
November 26, 2014 Filing 116 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Ex A to USE Motion to File Under Seal-Motion to Exclude Pulliam, #2 Sealed Document EX 1 to USE Motion to Exclude, #3 Sealed Document EX 2 to USE Motion to Exclude, #4 Sealed Document Ex 3 to USE Motion to Exclude, #5 Sealed Document Ex 4 to USE Motion to Exclude, #6 Sealed Document EX 5 to USE Motion to Exclude, #7 Sealed Document EX 6 to USE Motion to Exclude, #8 Sealed Document EX 7 to USE Motion to Exclude, #9 Sealed Document EX 8 to USE Motion to Exclude, #10 Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal, #11 Proposed Order Order Granting USE Motion to Exclude Pulliman) (Wehmeyer, Corey)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
October 13, 2014 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., re #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Amy)
October 6, 2014 Filing 112 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Olivier Taillieu)(Taillieu, Olivier)
October 3, 2014 Filing 111 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines for Discovery by Bruce Gates, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
September 29, 2014 Filing 110 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
September 24, 2014 **Notice of Correction: re Text Order on Motion to Reset Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. Text was modified to reflect hearing on Motion no. #88 only. (tr1)
September 24, 2014 Motion Hearing: #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 11/18/2014 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, (tr1)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #109 Motion to Reset Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. The hearing on SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro and Val Verde Investments, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dktno. 88)is RESET before Senior United States District Judge David A. Ezra in Courtroom 5,on the Third Floor of the John H. Wood, Jr. United States Courthouse on Tuesday, November 18, 2014 at 09:00 AM. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tr1) Modified text on 9/24/2014 (tr1).
September 19, 2014 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 88] by Bruce Gates, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Corey F. Wehmeyer, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
September 19, 2014 Filing 108 Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.'s ANSWER to #104 Amended Counterclaim, Amended Third Party Complaint,, by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd..(Davis, Amy)
September 19, 2014 Filing 107 Third-Party Defendant, Bruce Gates' ANSWER to #104 Amended Counterclaim, Amended Third Party Complaint,, by Bruce Gates.(Davis, Amy)
September 12, 2014 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix Supplemental Declaration of Olivier Taillieu, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
September 8, 2014 Filing 105 Sealed Document filed (rf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2014: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Proposed Order) (rf).
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #102 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kh)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #101 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kh)
September 5, 2014 Filing 104 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., amending, AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bruce Gates amending, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taillieu, Olivier) Modified on 9/8/2014, to edit text (rf).
September 5, 2014 Filing 103 Miscellaneous Objection to #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
September 5, 2014 Filing 102 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-A, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-B, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-C, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-D, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-E, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-F, #9 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-G, #10 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-H, #11 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-I, #12 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-J, #13 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-K, #14 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-L, #15 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-M, #16 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-N, #17 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-O, #18 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-P, #19 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-Q, #20 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-R, #21 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-S, #22 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-T, #23 Sealed Document Proposed Order) (Davis, Amy)
August 29, 2014 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Bruce Gates. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy Davis, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy) Modified on 8/29/2014 (rf).
August 29, 2014 Filing 100 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment by Bruce Gates, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
August 29, 2014 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "Bruce Gates" HAS BEEN ADDED AS A FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT**** re #101 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines . (rf)
August 26, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE of Settlement by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC (Taillieu, Olivier)
August 25, 2014 Filing 98 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines for Discovery by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING #94 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rf)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING #86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rf)
July 16, 2014 Motions No Longer Referred: #86 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #94 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (rf)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING #55 Motion for Entry of Default; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #65 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #65 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; MOOTING #87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #94 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kh)
July 10, 2014 MOTION REFERRED: referred #94 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines . Referral Judge: John W. Primomo. (rf)
July 9, 2014 Filing 94 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy Davis, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #86 Motion to Compel entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tr1)
July 8, 2014 MOTION REFERRED: referred #86 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Referral Judge: John W. Primomo. (rf)
July 2, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Answer, #2 Affidavit of Raffi Zerounian, #3 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 2, 2014 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2014 re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SDC Montana, LLC, Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, #55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana, LLC, and SDC Montana Consulting, LLC filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristin Anderson.)(rf)
July 2, 2014 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana, LLC, and SDC Montana Consulting, LLC (rf)
July 1, 2014 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Taillieu Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 to Taillieu Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 to Taillieu Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 to Taillieu Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5 to Taillieu Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 to Taillieu Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 7 to Taillieu Affidavit)(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 1, 2014 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Shapiro Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 to Shapiro Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 to Shapiro Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 to Shapiro Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5 to Shapiro Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 6 to Shapiro Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 7 to Shapiro Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 8 to Shapiro Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 9 to Shapiro Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 10 to Shapiro Affidavit, #11 Exhibit 11 to Shapiro Affidavit)(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 1, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier)
July 1, 2014 Filing 87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Bruce Gates, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC)(Davis, Amy)
June 20, 2014 Filing 86 MOTION to Compel Discovery by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Davis, Amy)
June 12, 2014 Filing 85 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines for Discovery by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Resetting Hearing on #55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana, LLC, and SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim :( Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2014 10:45 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, ( Discovery due by 6/20/2014,, Motions due by 7/1/2014,), GRANTING: #79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time and to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rf)
April 28, 2014 Motions No Longer Referred: #79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time and to Modify Scheduling Order (rf)
April 17, 2014 Filing 82 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines for Discovery and to Designate Expert Witnesses by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Setting Hearing on #55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana, LLC, and SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2014 10:45 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #79 Motion entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kh)
March 27, 2014 MOTION REFERRED: referred #79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time and to Modify Scheduling Order. Referral Judge: John W. Primomo. (rf)
March 26, 2014 Filing 79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time and to Modify Scheduling Order by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Affidavit of Amy Davis, #2 Proposed Order - Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time, #3 Proposed Order - Agreed Second Amended Scheduling Order)(Davis, Amy)
March 26, 2014 Filing 78 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines to Designate Expert Witnesses by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING #72 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING #72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rf)
March 21, 2014 Motions No Longer Referred: #72 MOTION for Protective Order and for Stay of Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to File (rf)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CANCELLING MOTIONS HEARING. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
March 12, 2014 Filing 75 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Davis, Amy)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #72 Motion for Protective Order; REFERRING #72 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kh)
March 7, 2014 MOTION REFERRED: referred #72 MOTION for Protective Order and for Stay of Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Referral Judge: John W. Primomo. (rf)
March 6, 2014 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Christopher Dedmon, re #72 MOTION for Protective Order and for Stay of Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Third Party Defendant Christopher Dedmon SDC Montana et al. (Lanfear, Daniel)
March 4, 2014 Filing 73 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #72 MOTION for Protective Order and for Stay of Discovery filed by Third Party Defendant Christopher Dedmon (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Olivier Taillieu, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Olivier Taillieu)(Taillieu, Olivier)
February 25, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION for Protective Order and for Stay of Discovery by Christopher Dedmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Lanfear, Daniel). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File on 3/5/2014 (rf).
February 21, 2014 Filing 71 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines to Designate Expert Witnesses by Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Davis, Amy)
January 28, 2014 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. SDC Montana, LLC served on 1/22/2014, answer due 2/12/2014. (Taillieu, Olivier)
January 28, 2014 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. SDC Montana Consulting, LLC served on 1/22/2014, answer due 2/12/2014. (Taillieu, Olivier)
January 28, 2014 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. Christopher Dedmon served on 1/22/2014, answer due 2/12/2014. (Taillieu, Olivier)
December 13, 2013 Filing 67 REPLY in support of Motion, filed by Christopher Dedmon, re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SDC Montana, LLC, Third Party Defendant Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, #55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana, LLC, and SDC Montana Consulting, LLC filed by Third Party Plaintiff Val Verde Investments, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Ringo Shapiro, Third Party Plaintiff SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Lanfear, Daniel) Modified docket text on 12/13/2013 (rg).
December 2, 2013 Filing 66 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SDC Montana, LLC, Third Party Defendant Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Taillieu Affidavit and Exhibits)(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 19, 2013 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "SDC Montana Consulting, LLC and SDC Montana LLC" HAVE BEEN ADDED AS FILERS OF THIS DOCUMENT**** re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (rf)
November 18, 2013 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ineffective Service of Process, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lanfear, Daniel) Modified on 11/19/2013, to add filers (rf).
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/7/2014, Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2014, Discovery due by 4/17/2014, Motions due by 5/1/2014. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
November 11, 2013 Filing 63 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther. (Wehmeyer, Corey)
November 8, 2013 Filing 62 ADR Report Filed - by Ringo Shapiro(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 8, 2013 Filing 61 ADR Report Filed - by Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.(Davis, Amy)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Setting Hearing on #46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2014 9:30 AM before Judge David Ezra,. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
November 7, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION to Continue by Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy Davis, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance, #3 Proposed Order - Second Amended Scheduling Order)(Davis, Amy)
November 5, 2013 Filing 58 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther. (Davis, Amy)
November 5, 2013 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro. Jack Gunther served on 10/7/2013, answer due 10/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons and Cross-Complaint on Jack Gunther)(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 5, 2013 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro. Bruce Gates served on 10/2/2013, answer due 10/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons and Cross-Complaint on Bruce Gates)(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 4, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana, LLC, and SDC Montana Consulting, LLC by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 4 - Attachment 1, #6 Exhibit 4 - Attachment 2, #7 Affidavit Olivier Taillieu In Support Of Entry of Default, #8 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 4, 2013 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro. SDC Montana Consulting, LLC served on 10/9/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons and Cross-Complaint on SDC Montana Consulting, LLC)(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 4, 2013 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro. SDC Montana, LLC served on 10/9/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons and Cross-Complaint on SDC Montana, LLC)(Taillieu, Olivier)
November 4, 2013 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro. Christopher Dedmon served on 10/9/2013, answer due 10/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons and Cross-Complaint on Christopher Dedmon)(Taillieu, Olivier)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
October 24, 2013 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Val Verde Investments, LLC, Bruce Gates, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Jack Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Stipulated Protective Order)(Zerounian, Raffi) Modified on 10/25/2013, to add filers (rf).
October 21, 2013 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint (Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint) by Jack Gunther.(Wehmeyer, Corey)
October 21, 2013 Filing 48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jack Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wehmeyer, Corey)
October 21, 2013 Filing 47 Third Party Defendant, ANSWER to Complaint re #40 (Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint) by Bruce Gates.(Wehmeyer, Corey) Modified on 10/21/2013, to link to doc #40 (rf).
October 21, 2013 Filing 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bruce Gates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wehmeyer, Corey)
October 21, 2013 Notice of Correction: ****PER COUNSEL'S REQUEST docs #44 & #45 HAVE BEEN LINKED TO DOC #40***** re #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #45 Answer to Complaint. (rf)
October 18, 2013 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint (Counterclaim) by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. #40 Counterclaim (Wehmeyer, Corey) Modified on 10/21/2013, to link to doc #40 (rf).
October 18, 2013 Filing 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. re: #40 Sixth Cause of Action (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wehmeyer, Corey) Modified on 10/21/2013, to link to doc #40 (rf).
October 1, 2013 Filing 43 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC.(Taillieu, Olivier)
September 30, 2013 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to Christopher Dedmon, Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC. (rf)
September 27, 2013 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Taillieu, Olivier)
September 27, 2013 Filing 40 COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Bruce Gates, Jack Gunther, Christopher Dedmon, SDC Montana Consulting, LLC, SDC Montana, LLC, filed by Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC.(Taillieu, Olivier)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/8/2013, Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2013, Discovery due by 1/17/2014, Motions due by 1/31/2014, Jury Selection set for 4/21/2014 9:30AM before Judge David Ezra, Jury Trial set for 4/21/2014 9:30 AM before Judge David Ezra. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
August 22, 2013 Filing 38 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time and to Modify Scheduling Order by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy Davis, #2 Affidavit of Olivier Taillieu, #3 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time and to Modify Scheduling Order, #4 Proposed Order - Agreed Scheduling Order)(Davis, Amy)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
August 1, 2013 Filing 36 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 072213, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Dismiss. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristin Anderson, Telephone number: 210-244-5048. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 8/22/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2013, (kma)
July 22, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Brief Concerning July 22, 2013 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Amy)
July 22, 2013 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2013 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Val Verde Investments, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristin Anderson.)(rf)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
May 30, 2013 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garelick, Scott)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Hearing on #16 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing reset for 7/22/2013 10:30 AM before Judge David Ezra,. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Setting Hearing on #16 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2013 10:00 AM before Judge David Ezra,. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rg)
April 23, 2013 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(George, John)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 4/21/2014 9:30AM before Judge David Ezra, Jury Trial set for 4/21/2014 9:30 AM before Judge David Ezra, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/8/2013, Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2013, Discovery due by 12/30/2013, Motions due by 1/31/2014,. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
March 11, 2013 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT - Rule 26(f) Joint Conference Report by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Wehmeyer, Corey)
March 1, 2013 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Val Verde Investments, LLC, Defendant Ringo Shapiro, Defendant SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Taillieu, Olivier)
February 22, 2013 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd., re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Val Verde Investments, LLC, Defendant Ringo Shapiro, Defendant SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wehmeyer, Corey)
February 20, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE , Consent/Non-Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC re #12 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order,, Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial, (Taillieu, Olivier)
February 18, 2013 Filing 22 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Davis, Amy)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to File Sealed Documents. Signed by Judge David Ezra. (rf)
February 14, 2013 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER DOC #21 ALL ATTACHMENTS TO DOC #16 HAVE BEEN SEALED**** re #16 MOTION to Dismiss . (rf)
February 13, 2013 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC #19 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Taillieu, Olivier)
February 13, 2013 Filing 19 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taillieu, Olivier)
February 12, 2013 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE**** re #16 MOTION to Dismiss (rf)
February 12, 2013 Notice of Correction: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO PLEASE DISREGARD THE DEFICIENCY NOTICE DOC #18 AS IT WAS ISSUED IN ERROR. THE DEFICIENCY WAS REMEMDIED BY THE FILING OF DOC #17**** re #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #17 Certificate of Service, #18 Deficiency Notice. (rf)
February 11, 2013 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC #16 MOTION to Dismiss (Taillieu, Olivier)
February 11, 2013 Filing 16 ****DOCUMENT IS SUFFICIENT See doc #17****DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE*** MOTION to Dismiss by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (SELAED Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ringo Shapiro Re Business Records, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - Pages 1-12, #3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - Pages 13-16, #4 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - Pages 17-19, #5 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit - Pages 20-27, #6 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 3-A to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 3-B to Affidavit Pages 1-12, #10 Exhibit 3-B to Affidavit Pages 13-16, #11 Exhibit 3-B to Affidavit Pages 17-19, #12 Exhibit 3-B to Affidavit Pages 20-27, #13 Exhibit 3-C to Affidavit)(Taillieu, Olivier) Modified on 2/12/2013, to designate deficiency (rf). Modified on 2/12/2013, to edit text (rf). Modified on 2/14/2013, all Attachments have been SEALED pursuant to Court Order doc #21 (rf).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
January 28, 2013 Filing 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.. (Wehmeyer, Corey)
January 28, 2013 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC amending, filed by U.S. Enercorp, Ltd..(Wehmeyer, Corey)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order and Advisory. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within 45 days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
January 8, 2013 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Olivier A. Taillieu; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 500019354. (rf)
January 8, 2013 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Raffi V. Zerounian; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 500019355. (rf)
January 8, 2013 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC #7 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7), #6 Answer to Complaint (Taillieu, Olivier)
January 8, 2013 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT ** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED**** re #7 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7), (wg)
January 7, 2013 Filing 7 ***** DCOUMENT DEFICIENT, MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ***** RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier) Modified on 1/8/2013 TO DESIGNATE DEFICIENCY (wg).
January 7, 2013 Filing 6 SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC; Val Verde Investments, LLC; and Ringo Shapiro's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC.(Taillieu, Olivier)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion of Raffi V. Zerounian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion of Olivier A. Taillieu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
December 31, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf)
December 31, 2012 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (rf)
December 31, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John G. George, Jr for Raffi V. Zerounian ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5162488) by on behalf of SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(George, John)
December 31, 2012 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John G. George, Jr for Olivier A. Taillieu ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5162487) by on behalf of SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC, Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(George, John)
December 31, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0542-5162484), filed by Ringo Shapiro, Val Verde Investments, LLC, SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(George, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Enercorp, Ltd. v. SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SDC Montana Bakken Exploration, LLC
Represented By: Maura Gewirtz
Represented By: Raffi V. Zerounian
Represented By: Scott M. Garelick
Represented By: Olivier A. Taillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ringo Shapiro
Represented By: Maura Gewirtz
Represented By: Raffi V. Zerounian
Represented By: Scott M. Garelick
Represented By: Olivier A. Taillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Val Verde Investments, LLC
Represented By: Maura Gewirtz
Represented By: Raffi V. Zerounian
Represented By: Scott M. Garelick
Represented By: Olivier A. Taillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jack Gunther
Represented By: Corey Frank Wehmeyer
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: President Bruce Gates
Represented By: Corey Frank Wehmeyer
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SDC Montana Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Webb Lanfear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Christopher Dedmon
Represented By: Daniel Webb Lanfear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SDC Montana, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Webb Lanfear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Enercorp, Ltd.
Represented By: James M. Truss
Represented By: Corey Frank Wehmeyer
Represented By: Benjamin Robertson
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?