Real Estate Training International, LLC v. The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Real Estate Training International, LLC
Defendant: The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc. and Nick Vertucci
Case Number: 5:2014cv00099
Filed: January 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California, Southern Division (Santa Anna). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING AS MOOT Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Set Motion Hearing for 15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ( Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2014 1:30 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc., Nick Vertucci. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2014,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Real Estate Training International, LLC v. The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Clint Alexander Corrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Vertucci
Represented By: Clint Alexander Corrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Estate Training International, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Moon
Represented By: San Antonio, TX 78247
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?