R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC v. Rios, et al
Plaintiff: R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC
Defendant: Rios, DEA Administator Michele M Leonhart, Geraldine Harris, Whitney Brewster, Albert Uresti, Fmr SSA Commissioner Michael J. Astrue, Wallace B. Jefferson, U.S. Sec. of V.A. Robert A. McDonald, David Garza, Blake Hawthorne, U.S. Treasurer Rosa G. Rios, Scott P. Serota, Tina Flores, Doyle Beneby, IRS Commissioner John Koskinen, OMP Director John Berry and David Long
Case Number: 5:2015cv00115
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING #45 Motion for Hearing for the reasons articulated in Order #46 Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ad)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING #38 Motion to Seal Case; DENYING #40 Motion ; DENYING #41 Motion ; DENYING #42 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ad)
March 17, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Ex-Parte Hearing by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rg)
March 1, 2016 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Albert Uresti, re #42 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, #41 MOTION to Rule on Objections filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, #40 MOTION to Remove filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, #38 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stecker, Donald)
March 1, 2016 Filing 43 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rosa G. Rios, re #42 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, #41 MOTION to Rule on Objections filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, #40 MOTION to Remove filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, #38 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gary)
February 26, 2016 Filing 42 PRO SE MOTION to Stay by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (aej)
February 26, 2016 Filing 41 PRO SE MOTION to Rule on Objections by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (aej)
February 26, 2016 Filing 40 PRO SE MOTION to Remove by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (aej)
February 16, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, re #28 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Scott P. Serota (aej)
February 16, 2016 Filing 38 PRO SE MOTION to Seal Case by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (aej)
January 21, 2016 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT in Support by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (aej)
October 14, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Reconsideration by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. (rg)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ac)
July 13, 2015 Filing 34 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (aej)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Order at #31 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (jp)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that document mailed to chambers of the undersigned shall be lodged in the record of this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Attachments: #1 Document, #2 Face of envelope)(jp)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, GRANTING #8 #14 #28 #6 #11 #13 Motions to Dismiss.DENYING #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC, DENYING #18 MOTION to Strike #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by John Berry, Robert A. McDonald, Michele M Leonhart, Michael J. Astrue, John Koskinen, Rosa G. Rios, Case shall be dismissed with prejudice unless Plaintiff obtains counsel within 30 days and files to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (aej)
May 11, 2015 Filing 30 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order and Final Judgment to #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Doyle Beneby. (Borbon, Kelli)
April 7, 2015 Filing 29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Scott P. Serota, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Orig. Pet., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Serota Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Bexar County Docket Sheet, #4 Proposed Order)(Caligur, Matthew)
April 7, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim by Scott P. Serota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Orig. Pet., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Serota Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Bexar County Docket Sheet, #4 Proposed Order)(Caligur, Matthew)
March 31, 2015 Filing 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by David Long, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Stephens, David)
March 31, 2015 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Geraldine Harris, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(McKinney, Dennis)
March 31, 2015 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Whitney Brewster, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(McKinney, Dennis)
March 31, 2015 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Blake Hawthorne, Wallace B. Jefferson, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Watkins, Karen)
March 30, 2015 Filing 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Doyle Beneby, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment)(Borbon, Kelli)
March 30, 2015 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Albert Uresti, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Stecker, Donald)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth for all proceedings. Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Withdrawing Referral, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John W. Primomo. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
March 27, 2015 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Michael J. Astrue, John Berry, John Koskinen, Michele M Leonhart, Robert A. McDonald, Rosa G. Rios, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gary)
March 27, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants by Michael J. Astrue, John Berry, John Koskinen, Michele M Leonhart, Robert A. McDonald, Rosa G. Rios. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Wright, Gary)
March 27, 2015 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tina Flores, David Garza, re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC (Kosanovich, Mark)
March 24, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants by R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC. Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (aej)
March 17, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael J. Astrue, John Berry, John Koskinen, Michele M Leonhart, Robert A. McDonald, Rosa G. Rios. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Wright, Gary)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that Mr. McKinney apply for admission to this District on or before March 30, 2015. Should Mr. McKinney fail to do so, he will be terminated as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rg)
March 11, 2015 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Albert Uresti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Stecker, Donald)
March 2, 2015 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order And Final Judgment by David Long. (Stephens, David)
March 2, 2015 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And Brief In Support by David Long.. Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Stephens, David)
March 2, 2015 A copy of doc #10 has been mailed to Mr. Denniw M. McKinney. (rf)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rf)
March 2, 2015 Filing 9 Doyle N. Beneby's ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Kelli M. Borbon added to party Doyle Beneby(pty:dft) by Doyle Beneby.(Borbon, Kelli)
March 2, 2015 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Doyle Beneby.. Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Borbon, Kelli)
February 23, 2015 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Tina Flores, David Garza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kosanovich, Mark)
February 23, 2015 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tina Flores, David Garza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B). Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Kosanovich, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/9/2015) (rg).
February 23, 2015 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Mark Kosanovich added to party David Garza(pty:dft) by David Garza.(Kosanovich, Mark)
February 23, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen L. Watkins for Dennis McKinney by on behalf of Whitney Brewster, Geraldine Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (Watkins, Karen)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John W. Primomo. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
February 13, 2015 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal by MICHAEL J ASTRUE, JOHN BERRY, JOHN KOSKINEN, MICHELE M LEONHART, ROBERT A. MCDONALD, ROSA G RIOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Wright, Gary)
February 12, 2015 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (rf)
February 12, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf)
February 12, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL J ASTRUE, ROBERT A. MCDONALD, JOHN KOSKINEN, JOHN BERRY, ROSA G RIOS, MICHELE M LEONHART , filed by MICHAEL J ASTRUE, ROBERT A. MCDONALD, JOHN KOSKINEN, JOHN BERRY, ROSA G RIOS, MICHELE M LEONHART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Wright, Gary) Modified on 2/13/2015, to edit text (rf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC v. Rios, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEA Administator Michele M Leonhart
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Harris
Represented By: Dennis M. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Brewster
Represented By: Dennis M. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Uresti
Represented By: Bradley S. Balderrama
Represented By: Donald P. Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fmr SSA Commissioner Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace B. Jefferson
Represented By: Karen L. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Sec. of V.A. Robert A. McDonald
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Garza
Represented By: Mark Kosanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Hawthorne
Represented By: Karen L. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Treasurer Rosa G. Rios
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott P. Serota
Represented By: Matthew W. Caligur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Flores
Represented By: Mark Kosanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Beneby
Represented By: Kelli M. Borbon
Represented By: Karen Ann Monsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS Commissioner John Koskinen
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMP Director John Berry
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Long
Represented By: David R. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Skye Foundation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?