Spencer v. Hughes Watters Askanase, et al
Plaintiff: Odis Spencer
Defendant: Hughes Watters Askanase, LLP
972) 247-0642 (fax: Christopher S. Ferguson and Jack O'Boyle
872) 247-0642 (fax: Robert D. Valdespino
Case Number: 5:2015cv00233
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - the Court instructs Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint against HWA that incorporates the arguments and facts articulated in his response (docket no. 17) by July 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Terminated party Robert D. Valdespino, Christopher S. Ferguson and Jack O'Boyle. The claims against HWA are still pending.; DENYING 12 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Hughes Watters Askanase, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
972) 247-0642 (fax: Christopher S. Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
972) 247-0642 (fax: Jack O'Boyle
Represented By: Travis H. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Watters Askanase, LLP
Represented By: C. Ed Harrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odis Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
872) 247-0642 (fax: Robert D. Valdespino
Represented By: Travis H. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?