Koenig v. Beekmans et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Koenig
Defendant: Anthony Beekmans, Jerome A. Beekmans and ZED Group (AUST) PTY LTD
Case Number: 5:2015cv00822
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L. Garcia
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 131 to Exclude /Limit the Testimony of Deputy Antonio Alvarez and Brief in Support Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer (mgr) Modified on 1/9/2018, to correct Judge (mgr).
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING 130 Motion to exclude and/or Limit the Testimony of Charles R. Ruble. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 89 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Billy S. Cox, Jr. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DENYING 112 Motion to limit the testimony of Defendants' Expert, Dr. William Dailey. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rg)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING 116 Motion to Limit the Testimony of Defense Expert Andrew E. Auber, M.D. Signed by Judge Richard B Farrer. (rg)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 106 Motion to exclude and/or Limit the Testimony of John S. Toohey, M.D. Signed by Judge Richard B Farrer. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenig v. Beekmans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Beekmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome A. Beekmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZED Group (AUST) PTY LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Koenig
Represented By: Loren W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?