Luppino v. York et al
Plaintiff: John N. Luppino
Defendant: Broadway National Bank, Steven Price and John V. York
Case Number: 5:2016cv00409
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (aej)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, the Court finds that this action is not stayed as a result of Republics pending bankruptcy. In addition, Luppino is given until December 22, 2016 to respond to Defendant Broadways Motion to Dismiss (Docket no. 7). Finally, Luppino is ordered to show cause by December 22, 2016 as to why his claims against Defendant Price should not be dismissed under Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luppino v. York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John N. Luppino
Represented By: Stephen Taylor Dennis
Represented By: Devin B. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?