Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC, Raymond Fuchs, Jaime Luis Gonzales, Michael Brooks Kieschnick and Charles Robison
Cross Claimant: AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC
Cross Defendant: Michael Brooks Kieschnick
Case Number: 5:2016cv00843
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER the Court awards Plaintiff $49,825.00 ($40,000.00 in total damages and $9,825.00 in attorneys fees). A separate judgment in favor of Plaintiff shall issue in accordance with Rule 58. Plaintiff is awarded costs and shall file a bill of costs in the form required by the Clerk of the Court, and with supporting documentation, within fourteen days of the entry of the Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 34 Motion for Default Judgment; GRANTING 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS that all remaining parties brief the Court on the issue of the awarding of damages by September 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. The Court ORDERS Defendant and Cross-Plaintiff AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC to obtain legal counsel and cause them to enter an appearance before submitting any further filings in this matter. Should any of these parties require additional time to obtain counsel, they must notify the court on or before January 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIH Alamo Ice House, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Luis Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brooks Kieschnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Michael Brooks Kieschnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?