Claudia Ocoro, et.al. vs. Armando Montelongo, Jr., et.al.
Plaintiff: Claudia Ocoro, Kassa Eden, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Jorie Scull, Dawn Klapcuniak, Linda Woods, Linda Van Orsdol, Ivan Rodriguez, Joshua Taylor, Janet Willison, Nichole Mollica, Sharon Louros, Cindy Morris, Devine Bates, Jacqueline Anteau, Robert Ritz, Robert Janesh, Dena Castello, Liana Kutejova, Karen Furlow, Sherilyn Correa, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Mark Harbolt, Anne Travis, Lucy Mahoney, Bridget Newsome, Cynthia Gebhardt, Bruce Bartelt, Robert Correa, Liz Scearce, Victor Gutierrez, Sharon Zakrewski, Shawnna Conner, Jim Scearce, Susan Rogge, Joseph Gebhardt, Martina Rolen-Torres, Louis English, Barbara Mowery, Kum-Lok Chia, Chris Hepburn, Suzanne Tuskey, Vickie Simmons, Shawn Schnoor, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Christine Noonan, Tina Rasalla, Kim Arendt, Joe Filippo, Judy Hunter, Daryl Noonan, Johnnie Parker, Donna Morris, Tiffany Bunnell, Kirk Krempel, Carol Thomas, Pamela Denny, Brian O'Neal, Cecilia Bunnell, Carlene Saelg, Susan Glass, Barbara Rodriguez, Agnes Florendo, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Cynthia Woods Jones, Israel Rosales, Tony Rasalla, Tamara Kurtz, Robert Claypoole, Duane Vadnais, Stacy Price-Brown, Sherry Waters Setzer, Frances Burke, Johnette Parmelee, Karen Suing, Doug Glenn, Linda Quelet, Ellen Menter, Hari Patel, Heather Le Vine, Tim Bauer, Anthony Ledesma, Scott Travis, Mark Zakrewski, Tammy Knutson, Knicole Porter, Marlene Anderson, Michael Neri, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Nicole Hepburn, Kelli Kaestler, Diana Alvarado Harris, Jessica Brower, Mary Gerhart, Joan Cover, Wendy Martin, Genevieve Edwards, William Menter, Cheryl Rich, Jan Favorite, Phillip White, Kathy Fuentes, Jack Acker, Margaret Monson, Vi Becker, Kristy Ritz, Gregory Hunter, Richard Buckley, Jean Norton, Debe Hickman, Howard Kinsey, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Diego Rodriguez, Elizabeth Ledesma, Michelle Weststeyn, Daniel Callaway, Jill Rolen-Torres, Michael Voronkov, Sherrie Kinsey, Brian Martin, Brooks Silva, Andy Monson, Charles Willison, Charoltte Christine, Gale Jones, Kelly Floyd, Susan Harbolt, Justin William Brown, James Fajardo, Jen Pigg, Vickie Schachter, Joe Strand, David Sisnetsky, Diane Ottolenghi, Harold Mahoney, Glenwood Young, Carla Strand, Susan Vesel and Angie Schlechter
Defendant: Armando Montelongo, Jr, Armando Montelongo, Jr., Real Estate Training International, LLC, License Branding, LLC and Performance Advantage Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01278
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Referring Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Filing 52 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (wg)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., All other pending motions before the Court are DENIED AS MOOT. The Court orders this case terminated on dockets. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
June 19, 2018 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION, The Court concludes that the plaintiffs have failed to plead sufficient facts in support of either RICO claim over which this Court has original jurisdiction. The Court declines to assert jurisdiction over the remaining state-law claims pursuant to 28 U.s.c. 1 367(c)(3). Therefore, the defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 39] will be GRANTED and the plaintiffs' case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #13 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
May 10, 2018 Filing 47 DEFENDANT'S REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC, re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Vargas, Santos)
May 3, 2018 Filing 46 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Wimmer, Christopher)
April 26, 2018 Filing 45 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #40 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. for More Definite Statement (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement)(Wimmer, Christopher)
April 20, 2018 Filing 44 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' #39 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Vargas, Santos) Modified on 4/23/2018 (wg).
April 20, 2018 Filing 43 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Defendants' #40 Motion for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Vargas, Santos) Modified on 4/23/2018 (wg).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING re #9 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (for Award of Costs Pursuant to Rule 41 and Request for Stay) filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, For the reasons stated in this Order, the Court DENIES defendants' motion for award of costs and a stay. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
April 19, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for More Definite Statement by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Vargas, Santos)
April 19, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Vargas, Santos)
April 9, 2018 Filing 38 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Karen Furlow, Mary Gerhart, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Tammy Knutson, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Vickie Schachter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski. (Wimmer, Christopher)
April 2, 2018 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC amending #1 Complaint., filed by Carlene Saelg, Kelly Floyd, Tina Rasalla, Judy Hunter, Diana Alvarado Harris, Israel Rosales, Jan Favorite, Johnette Parmelee, Karen Suing, Hari Patel, Diego Rodriguez, Cynthia Woods Jones, Wendy Martin, Charles Willison, Tony Rasalla, Louis English, Doug Glenn, Glenwood Young, Liana Kutejova, Chris Hepburn, Jill Rolen-Torres, Dena Castello, Pamela Denny, Joe Filippo, Robert Janesh, Linda Quelet, Linda Woods, Duane Vadnais, Diane Ottolenghi, Susan Harbolt, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Susan Vesel, Vickie Schachter, Ivan Rodriguez, Stacy Price-Brown, Brian O'Neal, Mark Harbolt, Karen Furlow, Christine Noonan, Martina Rolen-Torres, Janet Willison, Heather Le Vine, Howard Kinsey, Kristy Ritz, Sherrie Kinsey, Margaret Monson, Charoltte Christine, Barbara Rodriguez, Michael Neri, Genevieve Edwards, Daryl Noonan, Robert Correa, Donna Morris, Nicole Hepburn, Joan Cover, Shawn Schnoor, Jean Norton, Frances Burke, Victor Gutierrez, Sharon Louros, Carol Thomas, Mark Zakrewski, Vi Becker, Bridget Newsome, Robert Ritz, Jessica Brower, Kum-Lok Chia, Cheryl Rich, Justin William Brown, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Robert Claypoole, Sharon Zakrewski, Richard Buckley, Sherilyn Correa, Johnnie Parker, Claudia Ocoro, Debe Hickman, Agnes Florendo, Lucy Mahoney, Mary Gerhart, Susan Rogge, Carla Strand, Gregory Hunter, Nichole Mollica, Bruce Bartelt, Phillip White, Jack Acker, David Sisnetsky, Joe Strand, Brian Martin, Linda Van Orsdol, Kelli Kaestler, Anne Travis, Andy Monson, Gale Jones, Suzanne Tuskey, Vickie Simmons, Harold Mahoney, Kim Arendt, Marlene Anderson, Scott Travis, Cindy Morris, Tammy Knutson, Jen Pigg, Jorie Scull.(wg)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING re #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Robert Claypoole, et.al., Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
March 30, 2018 Filing 35 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Vargas, Santos)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #12 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS OF ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) AND TO COMPEL TO ARBITRATION MOTION to Compel filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Robert Claypoole, et.al.,The Court will withhold Judgment on the remainder of the plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, DENIED AS MOOT #12 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS OF ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) AND TO COMPEL TO ARBITRATION MOTION to Compel filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., GRANTED #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., GRANTED IN PART #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Robert Claypoole, et.al., A separate order will issue. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING re #28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kimberly D. Howatt filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., #27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey D. Cawdrey filed by Real Estate Training International, LLC, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr., Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (wg)
October 31, 2017 Filing 31 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. [Declaration of Christopher Wimmer in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply] (Wimmer, Christopher)
October 31, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Wimmer, Christopher)
October 24, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vargas, Santos)
October 24, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kimberly D. Howatt by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Howatt, Kimberly)
October 24, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey D. Cawdrey by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2017 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rf)
October 17, 2017 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Claypoole, Plaintiff Elizabeth Ledesma, Plaintiff Tim Bauer, Plaintiff Sharon Zakrewski, Plaintiff Duane Vadnais, Plaintiff Janet Willison, Plaintiff Linda Quelet, Plaintiff Karen Furlow, Plaintiff Kirk Krempel, Plaintiff Mark Zakrewski, Plaintiff Joe Strand, Plaintiff William Menter, Plaintiff Louis English, Plaintiff Martina Rolen-Torres, Plaintiff Susan Harbolt, Plaintiff Hari Patel, Plaintiff Michelle Weststeyn, Plaintiff Johnnie Parker, Plaintiff Israel Rosales, Plaintiff Knicole Porter, Plaintiff Jorie Scull, Plaintiff Vickie Schachter, Plaintiff Dawn Klapcuniak, Plaintiff Joseph Gebhardt, Plaintiff Diane Ottolenghi, Plaintiff Genevieve Edwards, Plaintiff Kristy Ritz, Plaintiff Cynthia Woods Jones, Plaintiff Donna Morris, Plaintiff Tony Rasalla, Plaintiff Jim Scearce, Plaintiff Brooks Silva, Plaintiff Jean Norton, Plaintiff Nicole Hepburn, Plaintiff Carlene Saelg, Plaintiff David Sisnetsky, Plaintiff Cynthia Gebhardt, Plaintiff Robert Ritz, Plaintiff Shawn Schnoor, Plaintiff Stacy Price-Brown, Plaintiff Joe Filippo, Plaintiff Jessica Brower, Plaintiff Christine Noonan, Plaintiff Michael Neri, Plaintiff Ellen Menter, Plaintiff Charles Willison, Plaintiff Johnette Parmelee, Plaintiff Shawnna Conner, Plaintiff Tina Rasalla, Plaintiff Diego Rodriguez, Plaintiff Sherrie Kinsey, Plaintiff Kum-Lok Chia, Plaintiff Anne Travis, Plaintiff Daniel Callaway, Plaintiff Sharon Louros, Plaintiff Robert Correa, Plaintiff Vi Becker, Plaintiff Cheryl Rich, Plaintiff Susan Rogge, Plaintiff Carla Strand, Plaintiff Vickie Simmons, Plaintiff Joshua Taylor, Plaintiff Tiffany Bunnell, Plaintiff Jan Favorite, Plaintiff Glenwood Young, Plaintiff Andy Monson, Plaintiff Dena Castello, Plaintiff Gregory Hunter, Plaintiff Debe Hickman, Plaintiff Robert Janesh, Plaintiff Anthony Ledesma, Plaintiff Michael Voronkov, Plaintiff Trinadh Bylipyudi, Plaintiff Sherry Waters Setzer, Plaintiff Jack Acker, Plaintiff Jemila Weldenhawayat, Plaintiff Chris Hepburn, Plaintiff Linda Woods, Plaintiff Jen Pigg, Plaintiff Judy Hunter, Plaintiff Justin William Brown, Plaintiff Devine Bates, Plaintiff Harold Mahoney, Plaintiff Carol Thomas, Plaintiff Liana Kutejova, Plaintiff Jacqueline Anteau, Plaintiff Margaret Monson, Plaintiff Gale Jones, Plaintiff Karen Suing, Plaintiff Kenneth Klapcuniak, Plaintiff Phillip White, Plaintiff Brian Martin, Plaintiff Suzanne Tuskey, Plaintiff Charoltte Christine, Plaintiff Kim Arendt, Plaintiff Pamela Denny, Plaintiff Brian O'Neal, Plaintiff Bridget Newsome, Plaintiff James Fajardo, Plaintiff Wendy Martin, Plaintiff Liz Scearce, Plaintiff Kelly Floyd, Plaintiff Lucy Mahoney, Plaintiff Tamara Kurtz, Plaintiff Agnes Florendo, Plaintiff Cindy Morris, Plaintiff Barbara Rodriguez, Plaintiff Kassa Eden, Plaintiff Susan Vesel, Plaintiff Cecilia Bunnell, Plaintiff Claudia Ocoro, Plaintiff Heather Le Vine, Plaintiff Jill Rolen-Torres, Plaintiff Richard Buckley, Plaintiff Victor Gutierrez, Plaintiff Angie Schlechter, Plaintiff Doug Glenn, Plaintiff Susan Glass, Plaintiff Mary Gerhart, Plaintiff Linda Van Orsdol, Plaintiff Kathy Fuentes, Plaintiff Marlene Anderson, Plaintiff Daryl Noonan, Plaintiff Lisa Carillo Romeo, Plaintiff Joan Cover, Plaintiff Sheila Mullins-Brill, Plaintiff Howard Kinsey, Plaintiff Bruce Bartelt, Plaintiff Diana Alvarado Harris, Plaintiff Nichole Mollica, Plaintiff Ivan Rodriguez, Plaintiff Barbara Mowery, Plaintiff Frances Burke, Plaintiff Scott Travis, Plaintiff Tammy Knutson, Plaintiff Sherilyn Correa, Plaintiff Mark Harbolt, Plaintiff Kelli Kaestler, Plaintiff Cuahutemoc Fuentes (Roldan, Peter)
October 10, 2017 Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC, re #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Claypoole, Plaintiff Elizabeth Ledesma, Plaintiff Tim Bauer, Plaintiff Sharon Zakrewski, Plaintiff Duane Vadnais, Plaintiff Janet Willison, Plaintiff Linda Quelet, Plaintiff Karen Furlow, Plaintiff Kirk Krempel, Plaintiff Mark Zakrewski, Plaintiff Joe Strand, Plaintiff William Menter, Plaintiff Louis English, Plaintiff Martina Rolen-Torres, Plaintiff Susan Harbolt, Plaintiff Hari Patel, Plaintiff Michelle Weststeyn, Plaintiff Johnnie Parker, Plaintiff Israel Rosales, Plaintiff Knicole Porter, Plaintiff Jorie Scull, Plaintiff Vickie Schachter, Plaintiff Dawn Klapcuniak, Plaintiff Joseph Gebhardt, Plaintiff Diane Ottolenghi, Plaintiff Genevieve Edwards, Plaintiff Kristy Ritz, Plaintiff Cynthia Woods Jones, Plaintiff Donna Morris, Plaintiff Tony Rasalla, Plaintiff Jim Scearce, Plaintiff Brooks Silva, Plaintiff Jean Norton, Plaintiff Nicole Hepburn, Plaintiff Carlene Saelg, Plaintiff David Sisnetsky, Plaintiff Cynthia Gebhardt, Plaintiff Robert Ritz, Plaintiff Shawn Schnoor, Plaintiff Stacy Price-Brown, Plaintiff Joe Filippo, Plaintiff Jessica Brower, Plaintiff Christine Noonan, Plaintiff Michael Neri, Plaintiff Ellen Menter, Plaintiff Charles Willison, Plaintiff Johnette Parmelee, Plaintiff Shawnna Conner, Plaintiff Tina Rasalla, Plaintiff Diego Rodriguez, Plaintiff Sherrie Kinsey, Plaintiff Kum-Lok Chia, Plaintiff Anne Travis, Plaintiff Daniel Callaway, Plaintiff Sharon Louros, Plaintiff Robert Correa, Plaintiff Vi Becker, Plaintiff Cheryl Rich, Plaintiff Susan Rogge, Plaintiff Carla Strand, Plaintiff Vickie Simmons, Plaintiff Joshua Taylor, Plaintiff Tiffany Bunnell, Plaintiff Jan Favorite, Plaintiff Glenwood Young, Plaintiff Andy Monson, Plaintiff Dena Castello, Plaintiff Gregory Hunter, Plaintiff Debe Hickman, Plaintiff Robert Janesh, Plaintiff Anthony Ledesma, Plaintiff Michael Voronkov, Plaintiff Trinadh Bylipyudi, Plaintiff Sherry Waters Setzer, Plaintiff Jack Acker, Plaintiff Jemila Weldenhawayat, Plaintiff Chris Hepburn, Plaintiff Linda Woods, Plaintiff Jen Pigg, Plaintiff Judy Hunter, Plaintiff Justin William Brown, Plaintiff Devine Bates, Plaintiff Harold Mahoney, Plaintiff Carol Thomas, Plaintiff Liana Kutejova, Plaintiff Jacqueline Anteau, Plaintiff Margaret Monson, Plaintiff Gale Jones, Plaintiff Karen Suing, Plaintiff Kenneth Klapcuniak, Plaintiff Phillip White, Plaintiff Brian Martin, Plaintiff Suzanne Tuskey, Plaintiff Charoltte Christine, Plaintiff Kim Arendt, Plaintiff Pamela Denny, Plaintiff Brian O'Neal, Plaintiff Bridget Newsome, Plaintiff James Fajardo, Plaintiff Wendy Martin, Plaintiff Liz Scearce, Plaintiff Kelly Floyd, Plaintiff Lucy Mahoney, Plaintiff Tamara Kurtz, Plaintiff Agnes Florendo, Plaintiff Cindy Morris, Plaintiff Barbara Rodriguez, Plaintiff Kassa Eden, Plaintiff Susan Vesel, Plaintiff Cecilia Bunnell, Plaintiff Claudia Ocoro, Plaintiff Heather Le Vine, Plaintiff Jill Rolen-Torres, Plaintiff Richard Buckley, Plaintiff Victor Gutierrez, Plaintiff Angie Schlechter, Plaintiff Doug Glenn, Plaintiff Susan Glass, Plaintiff Mary Gerhart, Plaintiff Linda Van Orsdol, Plaintiff Kathy Fuentes, Plaintiff Marlene Anderson, Plaintiff Daryl Noonan, Plaintiff Lisa Carillo Romeo, Plaintiff Joan Cover, Plaintiff Sheila Mullins-Brill, Plaintiff Howard Kinsey, Plaintiff Bruce Bartelt, Plaintiff Diana Alvarado Harris, Plaintiff Nichole Mollica, Plaintiff Ivan Rodriguez, Plaintiff Barbara Mowery, Plaintiff Frances Burke, Plaintiff Scott Travis, Plaintiff Tammy Knutson, Plaintiff Sherilyn Correa, Plaintiff Mark Harbolt, Plaintiff Kelli Kaestler, Plaintiff Cuahutemoc Fuentes (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Cawdrey)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Wimmer)(Wimmer, Christopher)
March 27, 2017 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2017 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS OF ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) AND TO COMPEL TO ARBITRATION MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER & REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER WITHDRAWNING re 14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John W. Primomo. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 20, 2017 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wimmer, Christopher)
March 20, 2017 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS OF ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) AND TO COMPEL TO ARBITRATION MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Wimmer, Christopher)
March 20, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jacqueline Anteau, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Daniel Callaway, Shawnna Conner, Kassa Eden, James Fajardo, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Susan Glass, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Ellen Menter, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Knicole Porter, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Angie Schlechter, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Joshua Taylor, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn (Wimmer, Christopher)
March 17, 2017 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC, re #9 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (for Award of Costs Pursuant to Rule 41 and Request for Stay) filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2017 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jack Acker, Marlene Anderson, Jacqueline Anteau, Kim Arendt, Bruce Bartelt, Devine Bates, Tim Bauer, Vi Becker, Jessica Brower, Justin William Brown, Richard Buckley, Cecilia Bunnell, Tiffany Bunnell, Frances Burke, Trinadh Bylipyudi, Daniel Callaway, Lisa Carillo Romeo, Dena Castello, Kum-Lok Chia, Charoltte Christine, Robert Claypoole, Shawnna Conner, Robert Correa, Sherilyn Correa, Joan Cover, Pamela Denny, Kassa Eden, Genevieve Edwards, Louis English, James Fajardo, Jan Favorite, Joe Filippo, Agnes Florendo, Kelly Floyd, Kathy Fuentes, Cuahutemoc Fuentes, Karen Furlow, Cynthia Gebhardt, Joseph Gebhardt, Mary Gerhart, Susan Glass, Doug Glenn, Victor Gutierrez, Mark Harbolt, Susan Harbolt, Diana Alvarado Harris, Chris Hepburn, Nicole Hepburn, Debe Hickman, Gregory Hunter, Judy Hunter, Robert Janesh, Cynthia Woods Jones, Gale Jones, Kelli Kaestler, Howard Kinsey, Sherrie Kinsey, Dawn Klapcuniak, Kenneth Klapcuniak, Tammy Knutson, Kirk Krempel, Tamara Kurtz, Liana Kutejova, Heather Le Vine, Anthony Ledesma, Elizabeth Ledesma, Sharon Louros, Lucy Mahoney, Harold Mahoney, Wendy Martin, Brian Martin, Ellen Menter, William Menter, Nichole Mollica, Andy Monson, Margaret Monson, Cindy Morris, Donna Morris, Barbara Mowery, Sheila Mullins-Brill, Michael Neri, Bridget Newsome, Christine Noonan, Daryl Noonan, Jean Norton, Brian O'Neal, Claudia Ocoro, Diane Ottolenghi, Johnnie Parker, Johnette Parmelee, Hari Patel, Jen Pigg, Knicole Porter, Stacy Price-Brown, Linda Quelet, Tina Rasalla, Tony Rasalla, Cheryl Rich, Kristy Ritz, Robert Ritz, Barbara Rodriguez, Diego Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Susan Rogge, Jill Rolen-Torres, Martina Rolen-Torres, Israel Rosales, Carlene Saelg, Jim Scearce, Liz Scearce, Vickie Schachter, Angie Schlechter, Shawn Schnoor, Jorie Scull, Sherry Waters Setzer, Brooks Silva, Vickie Simmons, David Sisnetsky, Carla Strand, Joe Strand, Karen Suing, Joshua Taylor, Carol Thomas, Anne Travis, Scott Travis, Suzanne Tuskey, Duane Vadnais, Linda Van Orsdol, Susan Vesel, Michael Voronkov, Jemila Weldenhawayat, Michelle Weststeyn, Phillip White, Charles Willison, Janet Willison, Linda Woods, Glenwood Young, Mark Zakrewski, Sharon Zakrewski, re #9 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (for Award of Costs Pursuant to Rule 41 and Request for Stay) filed by Defendant Real Estate Training International, LLC, Defendant Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Defendant License Branding, LLC, Defendant Armando Montelongo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher Wimmer, #2 Proposed Order)(Wimmer, Christopher)
March 6, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Cawdrey, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss CLAIMS OF ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) AND TO COMPEL TO ARBITRATION by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Corbett, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey). Added MOTION to Compel on 3/7/2017 (rf).
March 3, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey D. Cawdrey on behalf of License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC (Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly D. Howatt on behalf of License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC (Howatt, Kimberly)
March 3, 2017 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees (for Award of Costs Pursuant to Rule 41 and Request for Stay) by License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Cawdrey, #2 Affidavit of Nathaniel C. Corbett, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Part 1 of 8, #6 Exhibit Part 2 of 8, #7 Exhibit Part 3 of 8, #8 Exhibit Part 4 of 8, #9 Exhibit Part 5 of 8, #10 Exhibit Part 6 of 8, #11 Exhibit Part 7 of 8, #12 Exhibit Part 8 of 8)(Cawdrey, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Wimmer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Fisher. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter Roldan. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
January 27, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enrique G. Serna (Fisher) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9240977) by on behalf of Claudia Ocoro. (Serna, Enrique)
January 27, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enrique G. Serna (Roldan) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9240959) by on behalf of Claudia Ocoro. (Serna, Enrique)
January 27, 2017 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Claudia Ocoro as to All Defendants. (Serna, Enrique)
January 5, 2017 Filing 5 ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL, PRO-HAC VICE MOTIONS MUST BE FILED INDIVIDUALLY FOR EACH ATTORNEY ***DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enrique G. Serna for Chris Wimmer and Emergent PLLC Lawyers ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9166742) (wg)
January 3, 2017 Filing 4 ****DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, CANNOT ATTACH MOTIONS PRO HAC, MUST BE FILED INDIVIDUALLY ***PLZ. REFILE *** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enrique G. Serna for Chris Wimmer and Emergent PLLC Lawyers ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9166742) by on behalf of Claudia Ocoro. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Roldan, #2 Pro Hac Fisher)(Serna, Enrique) Modified on 1/5/2017 (wg).
December 21, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to License Branding, LLC, Armando Montelongo, Jr, Performance Advantage Group, Inc., Real Estate Training International, LLC. (wg)
December 20, 2016 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (wg)
December 20, 2016 Case Randomly Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
December 20, 2016 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Claudia Ocoro. (Serna, Enrique)
December 20, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9138405), filed by Claudia Ocoro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Serna, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claudia Ocoro, et.al. vs. Armando Montelongo, Jr., et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Ocoro
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassa Eden
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemila Weldenhawayat
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorie Scull
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Klapcuniak
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Woods
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Van Orsdol
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Taylor
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Willison
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Mollica
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Louros
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Morris
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devine Bates
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Anteau
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ritz
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Janesh
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Castello
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liana Kutejova
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Furlow
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherilyn Correa
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuahutemoc Fuentes
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Harbolt
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Travis
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Mahoney
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Newsome
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gebhardt
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Bartelt
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Correa
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Scearce
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Gutierrez
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Zakrewski
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnna Conner
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Scearce
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rogge
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gebhardt
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Rolen-Torres
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis English
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Mowery
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kum-Lok Chia
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Hepburn
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Tuskey
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Simmons
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Schnoor
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Carillo Romeo
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Noonan
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Rasalla
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Arendt
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Filippo
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hunter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Noonan
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Parker
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Morris
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bunnell
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Krempel
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Thomas
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Denny
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian O'Neal
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Bunnell
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlene Saelg
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Glass
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Florendo
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Mullins-Brill
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Woods Jones
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Rosales
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Rasalla
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Kurtz
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Claypoole
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Vadnais
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Price-Brown
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Waters Setzer
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Burke
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnette Parmelee
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Suing
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Glenn
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Quelet
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Menter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hari Patel
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Le Vine
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Bauer
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ledesma
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Travis
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Zakrewski
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Knutson
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knicole Porter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Anderson
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Neri
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Klapcuniak
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Hepburn
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Kaestler
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Alvarado Harris
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Brower
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gerhart
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Cover
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Martin
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Edwards
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Menter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Rich
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Favorite
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip White
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Fuentes
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Acker
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Monson
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vi Becker
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Ritz
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hunter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Buckley
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Norton
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debe Hickman
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Kinsey
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinadh Bylipyudi
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ledesma
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Weststeyn
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Callaway
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Rolen-Torres
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Voronkov
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Kinsey
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Martin
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooks Silva
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Monson
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Willison
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charoltte Christine
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Jones
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Floyd
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Harbolt
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin William Brown
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fajardo
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen Pigg
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Schachter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Strand
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sisnetsky
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Ottolenghi
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Mahoney
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenwood Young
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Strand
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Vesel
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Schlechter
Represented By: Christopher Wimmer
Represented By: Peter Roldan
Represented By: Enrique G. Serna
Represented By: William Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Montelongo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Montelongo, Jr.
Represented By: Santos Vargas
Represented By: Jason Davis
Represented By: Kimberly D. Howatt
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cawdrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Estate Training International, LLC
Represented By: Santos Vargas
Represented By: Jason Davis
Represented By: Kimberly D. Howatt
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cawdrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: License Branding, LLC
Represented By: Santos Vargas
Represented By: Jason Davis
Represented By: Kimberly D. Howatt
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cawdrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Advantage Group, Inc.
Represented By: Santos Vargas
Represented By: Jason Davis
Represented By: Kimberly D. Howatt
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cawdrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?