Rangel, et al v. Adtalem Global Education, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Brown, Christopher Martin, Younghee Bermingham, Tristen Wilson, Crystal Hayden, Joanna Aguilera, Frankie Early, Jr., George Van-Lare, Jose Sanchez, Christina Cabello, Melissa Wilson, Justin Wiggins, Martin Oloyede, Patrick Acheampong, Kinney Barcuch, Christian Burrow, Rhonda James, Saul Vega, Kevin D. Earls, Terrell White, Seth Adomako, Denairius Robinson, II, Mr. Luis Rangel, Christal Turner, Shawn J. Austin, Teresa Anaya, Rosalinda A Vela Escobar, Victor Sekgantso, Mark Davis, Elisabeth Nguyen, Roshawn Sampson, Nathalie Yeka, David W. Jessop, Tyhessia Ellis, Catherine McCarty, Nina Burns, Latasha Solomon, Alan Ta, Candace D. Smith, Med Cullins, Mike Dean, Emmanuel Makari, Emran Alhyasat, Norma Martinez-Cantu, Kimberly Searcy, Nathaniel Jones, Scott Sullivan, Edward Watts, Willie Garret, Michelle Orr, Trevor Reed, Courtney Frazier, Heather Michelle Emmons, Richard Shaw, Miranda Van Colen, Derrick Keith, Prosper Kiswaga, Andres Salazar, Lawrence Owonikoko, Godfrey Momanyi, Kasandra McGhee, Lisa Howard, Sharonda Ford, Julio Valencia, Wayne Carl Williams, Lachanna Sneed, Jeremy Hengy, Sean Williams, Gladys Beristain, Jayson Fox, Jennifer Gailley and Ryan Grizzle
Defendant: Adtalem Global Education, Inc. and DeVry University, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Joshua Palczynsky, Corey Carroll, Rebecca Miller, Michelle Garrett, Eddie Silas, Marquita Holloman-Herod, Tuwandra Harris, Mitchell Garrett, Pita Nereida, Billy Morris, Kendric Murray, Brianda Aguilar and Linda Hair
Consolidated Plaintiff: Barrie Bergans, Lee Nicholson, Corey Kincaid, Joshua Thompson, Dwayne Bolden, Whitney Burton, Kevin Guest, David Gabriel Hardin, Claudia Acosta, April Wilson, Brad Booth, Khang Nguyen, David Corvin, Shariq Mohammad, Tamar Rockmore, Omer Qureshi, Troy Lindberg, Jeffery LaFayette, Michelle Donahue, Yumeka Gibson, Bobby Garza, Stephanie Yell, Brandon Jordan, Diego Sanchez DeJarmy, Tarig Owens, Ruben Espinoza, Arkeiska Jefferson, Kevin Sr. Lewis, Luis A. Lozano, Teneka Latasha Tillis and Jose Jovel
Counter Plaintiff: Ebony Ijeh
Case Number: 5:2018cv00082
Filed: January 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Luis Rangel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Begley Stipulation And Agreement Of Compromise, Settlement And Release)(Fabry, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority to #54 Notice (Other) by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 55 ATTACHMENT Exhibit A to #54 Notice (Other) by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
February 19, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Defendants' Re-Filed Motion To Dismiss by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. re #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gonsalves, Terance)
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 STIPULATION THAT PENDING MTD BRIEFING APPLIES TO THE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gonsalves, Terance)
January 22, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION on Service of Process by Luis Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fabry, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 51 COMPLAINT in Intervention ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11640262). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Luis Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabry, John)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion to Join. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 49 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY -IT IS A DUPLICATE OF ENTRY #48)Reply in Support of Re-Filed Rule12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. (mgr) Modified on 1/10/2019, to edit text (mgr).
January 10, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #47 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
January 9, 2019 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation For their Reply in Support of their Re-filed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit)(Gonsalves, Terance)
January 3, 2019 Filing 46 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #43 Unopposed MOTION to Join Motion to Intervene by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 45 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: MISSING PROPOSED ORDER. Please do not re-file the entire document, please only file the ProposedOrder using the Attachment event and link to the Motion re #43 Unopposed MOTION to Join Motion to Intervene (mgr)
January 2, 2019 Filing 44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Luis Rangel, re #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. (Fabry, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 43 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -MISSING PROPOSED ORDER***Unopposed MOTION to Join Motion to Intervene by Luis Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fabry, John) Modified on 1/3/2019 (mgr).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE Of Admission by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance)
December 18, 2018 Filing 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING #36 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #35 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to Defendants' #14 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs request leave to file a surreply to respond to Defendants' argument that the heightened pleading standard applies to all of Plaintiffs' claims. Since Defendants made the same argument in their motion, the motion for leave to file a surreply is denied. Even if the reply brief did raise new arguments, the Court does not consider arguments raised for the first time in a reply brief. Accordingly, there is no prejudice to Plaintiffs and no need for a surreply brief. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ch)
October 3, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #36 MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Luis Rangel (Gonsalves, Terance)
October 1, 2018 Filing 37 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #35 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Luis Rangel (Gonsalves, Terance)
September 27, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: referred #36 MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion for Protective Order . Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #36 Motion for Reconsideration to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
September 26, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re #34 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Luis Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fabry, John)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
September 4, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: referred #33 MOTION for Protective Order . Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #33 Motion for Protective Order to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
August 31, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Protective Order by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonsalves, Terance)
August 16, 2018 Filing 32 ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.(Gonsalves, Terance)
August 1, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #15 MOTION for Discovery (mgr)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 8/17/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2019, Discovery due by 9/2/2019, Motions due by 10/2/2019,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
July 27, 2018 Filing 29 Scheduling Recommendations (Amended) by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Confernce and Submit Revised Scheduling Recommendations Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 18, 2018 Filing 27 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference and Submit Revised Scheduling Recommendations to #26 Deficiency Notice,, by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
July 17, 2018 Filing 26 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Remarks: Proposed order required. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order usingthe (Attachment) event from menu and link the proposed order to this document. See page 10, item 9d of theAdministrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas re #25 Unopposed MOTION For Extension Of Time to Conduct 26(F) Conference and Submit Revised Scheduling Recommendations (mgr)
July 17, 2018 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRED***Unopposed MOTION For Extension Of Time to Conduct 26(F) Conference and Submit Revised Scheduling Recommendations by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John) Modified on 7/17/2018 (mgr).
July 17, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #15 Motion for Discovery Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
July 12, 2018 Filing 22 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/12/2018 11:06:04 AM ]. File Size [ 16008 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:21 ]. (admin).
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
July 11, 2018 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Amended Joint Status Report on Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
July 11, 2018 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Joint Advisory Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
July 6, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #15 MOTION for Discovery filed by Plaintiff Luis Rangel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gonsalves, Terance)
July 3, 2018 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Luis Rangel, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. Plaintiffs' Response (Fabry, John)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING HEARING, ( Discovery Hearing set for 7/12/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
July 2, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: referred #15 MOTION for Discovery . Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (aej)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #15 Motion for Discovery to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
June 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Discovery by Luis Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fabry, John)
June 5, 2018 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
May 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Adtalem Global Education, Inc. answer due 6/5/2018; DeVry University, Inc. answer due 6/5/2018. (sf)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses/Replies. The new deadline for Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to #11 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is June 5, 2018. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a response to any responsive pleading filed within that prescribed time is July 3, 2018, and the deadline for Defendants to file a reply brief is July 17, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in light of #11 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #12 Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny as Moot #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss In Light of #11 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' #12 Motion is GRANTED as to its request for the Court to deny as moot #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court will deny as moot #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by separate order. All other relief requested by Plaintiffs in their #12 Motion is DENIED. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
May 16, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gonsalves, Terance)
May 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike /Deny As Moot Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
May 8, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Luis Rangel.(Fabry, John)
May 2, 2018 Filing 10 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Recommendations by Luis Rangel. (Fabry, John)
April 24, 2018 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE ENTRY WAS EDITED TO ADD DEVRY UNIVERSITY, INC. AS FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT***re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (mgr)
April 24, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
April 24, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance) Modified on 4/24/2018, to add filer(mgr).
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terance A. Gonsalves for Adtalem Global Education, Inc.,Terance A. Gonsalves for DeVry University, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
March 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Terance Gonsalves ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10629085) by on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lecholop, Stephen)
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. Attorney Stephen K. Lecholop, II added to party Adtalem Global Education, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lecholop, Stephen)
March 8, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Rangel as to All Defendants. (Fabry, John)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Jose Luis Munoz regarding Attorney Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr)
January 25, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
January 25, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10396723). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Luis Rangel, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabry, John) Modified on 1/26/2018 to add filers(mgr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangel, et al v. Adtalem Global Education, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Brown
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Martin
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Younghee Bermingham
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristen Wilson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hayden
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Aguilera
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Early, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Van-Lare
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sanchez
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Cabello
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Wilson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wiggins
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Oloyede
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Acheampong
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinney Barcuch
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Burrow
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda James
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Vega
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Earls
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell White
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Adomako
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denairius Robinson, II
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Luis Rangel
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christal Turner
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn J. Austin
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Anaya
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalinda A Vela Escobar
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Sekgantso
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Davis
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Nguyen
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshawn Sampson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathalie Yeka
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Jessop
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyhessia Ellis
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine McCarty
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Burns
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Solomon
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Ta
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace D. Smith
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med Cullins
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Dean
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Makari
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emran Alhyasat
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Martinez-Cantu
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Searcy
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Jones
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sullivan
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Watts
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Garret
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Orr
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Reed
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Frazier
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Michelle Emmons
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Shaw
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Van Colen
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Keith
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prosper Kiswaga
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Salazar
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Owonikoko
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Godfrey Momanyi
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasandra McGhee
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Howard
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharonda Ford
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Valencia
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Carl Williams
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lachanna Sneed
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hengy
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Williams
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Beristain
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson Fox
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gailley
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Grizzle
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adtalem Global Education, Inc.
Represented By: Terance A. Gonsalves
Represented By: Stephen K. Lecholop, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry University, Inc.
Represented By: Terance A. Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joshua Palczynsky
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Corey Carroll
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rebecca Miller
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michelle Garrett
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Eddie Silas
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marquita Holloman-Herod
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tuwandra Harris
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mitchell Garrett
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pita Nereida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Billy Morris
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kendric Murray
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brianda Aguilar
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Linda Hair
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Barrie Bergans
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lee Nicholson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Corey Kincaid
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joshua Thompson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dwayne Bolden
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Whitney Burton
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Guest
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Gabriel Hardin
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Claudia Acosta
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: April Wilson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brad Booth
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Khang Nguyen
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Corvin
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shariq Mohammad
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tamar Rockmore
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Omer Qureshi
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Troy Lindberg
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeffery LaFayette
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michelle Donahue
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Yumeka Gibson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bobby Garza
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stephanie Yell
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brandon Jordan
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Diego Sanchez DeJarmy
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tarig Owens
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ruben Espinoza
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Arkeiska Jefferson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Sr. Lewis
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Luis A. Lozano
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Teneka Latasha Tillis
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jose Jovel
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Ebony Ijeh
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?