League of United Latin American Citizens, et al. v. Gregory Wayne Abbott, et al. Featured Case

Several prominent law firms and professors have filed lawsuits in four federal district courts alleging that the Electoral College voting system used in the nation's presidential elections is unconstitutional. The complaints allege that the system denies citizens the right to an equal vote, in violation of the First Amendment rights to political expression and association and the principle of one-person-one-vote under the Fourteenth Amendment. The complaint filed in Texas names Texas Governor Greg Abbott and Secretary of State Rolando Pablos as defendants.

Plaintiff: Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr., Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde and Doris Williams
Defendant: Gregory Wayne Abbott and Rolando Pablos
Case Number: 5:2018cv00175
Filed: February 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A. Ezra
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #19-50214 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re 45 Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions here (dtg)
April 2, 2019 Set APPEAL Deadlines. re Notice of Appeal, 45 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) : ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL DUE BY 4/16/2019. (dtg)
March 29, 2019 Filing 47 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2/13/19, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Angela Hailey, Telephone number: 210.244.5048. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/19/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2019, Appeal Record due by 4/15/2019, (Hailey, Angela)
March 21, 2019 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams for dates of 02/13/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Court Reporter: Angela Hailey.. (Calaf, Maria)
March 13, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL following 45 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed), by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (mgr)
March 13, 2019 Filing 45 Appeal of Final Judgment 44 , 43 by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-11874496) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Calaf, Maria)
February 26, 2019 Filing 44 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (aej)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
February 13, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2019 re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Rolando Pablos, Gregory Wayne Abbott (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(aej)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Resetting Hearing on 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief : Motion Hearing reset for 2/13/2019 10:30 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
February 8, 2019 Text Order GRANTING 40 Sealed Motion. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 Sealed Motion filed (aej)
February 8, 2019 Text Order GRANTING 38 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
February 8, 2019 Text Order GRANTING 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nafees Syed. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maria Amelia Calaf ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11735613) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Calaf, Maria)
February 7, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document, # 2 Proposed Order) (Calaf, Maria)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Hearing on 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief : Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2019 1:00 PM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
December 4, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
November 29, 2018 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bitter, Adam)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Scheduling Order filed by Rolando Pablos, Gregory Wayne Abbott. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
August 30, 2018 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Scheduling Order by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 7, 2018 Filing 33 Pretrial Disclosures of Experts by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Mauser, Amy)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
July 22, 2018 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Designations by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calaf, Maria)
June 20, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE Joint Statement of Intent Regarding Mediation by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams (Calaf, Maria)
May 21, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos, re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Rolando Pablos, Defendant Gregory Wayne Abbott (Bitter, Adam)
May 10, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline to file a Response/Reply is May 21, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
May 9, 2018 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bitter, Adam)
May 7, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams, re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Rolando Pablos, Defendant Gregory Wayne Abbott (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Calaf, Maria)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 6/20/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2018, Discovery due by 10/22/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2018, Motions due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
May 2, 2018 Filing 25 Scheduling Recommendations Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Scheduling Recommendations by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Calaf, Maria)
May 2, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
May 1, 2018 Filing 24 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Calaf, Maria)
May 1, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Calaf, Maria)
April 16, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. The new deadline to file a response is May 7, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 13, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calaf, Maria)
April 12, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 12, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
April 9, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
April 9, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam N. Bitter for Patrick Strawbridge ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10661315) by on behalf of Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bitter, Adam)
April 9, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam N. Bitter for William S. Consovoy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10661282) by on behalf of Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bitter, Adam)
April 2, 2018 Filing 18 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
March 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gregory Wayne Abbott answer due 4/9/2018; Rolando Pablos answer due 4/9/2018. (aej)
March 23, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The new deadline to file an Answer is April 9, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 23, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 23, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 23, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 23, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 22, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rolando Pablos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 22, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Allen Simms, Jr on behalf of Samuel Issacharoff ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10598589) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simms, Jack)
March 22, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Allen Simms, Jr on behalf of James R. Martin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10598467) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simms, Jack)
March 22, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Allen Simms, Jr on behalf of Jennifer Duncan Hackett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10598437) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simms, Jack)
March 22, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Allen Simms, Jr on behalf of Allison M. Vissichelli, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10598057) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simms, Jack)
March 14, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 14, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 14, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 14, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 14, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 14, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello on behalf of Lisa L. Barclay ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10563105) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello on behalf of Karen L. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10563078) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello on behalf of James P. Denvir ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10563060) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 13, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello on behalf of Hamish P. M. Hume ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10563047) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello on behalf of Amy L. Neuhardt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10563035) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello on behalf of Amy J. Mauser ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10562848) by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rolando Pablos. (aej)
March 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gregory Wayne Abbott. (aej)
March 5, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas. to Governor Gregory Abbott... et al (Vera, Luis)
February 26, 2018 Text Order GRANTING 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hw)
February 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marco Kelly Guerrero for Mary Melissa Whittle by on behalf of Yvonne M. Davis, Hector Flores, League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas, League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, Joseph C. Parker, Jr, Mary Ramos, Gloria Ray, Guadalupe Torres, Ray Velarde, Doris Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Guerrero, Marco)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to attorneys, Samuel Isaacharoff and Mary White, regarding admittance to practice in the Western District. (aej)
February 21, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rf)
February 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Challengng Electoral College System ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10483131). No Summons requested at this time, filed by League of United Latin American Citizens, Sanford Levinson, League of United Latin American Citizens of Texas, Hector Flores, Yvonne M. Davis, Doris Williams, Ray Velarde, Guadalupe Torres, Gloria Ray, Mary Ramos, Joseph C. Parker, Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vera, Luis) Modified on 2/21/2018, to correct and add filers (rf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of United Latin American Citizens, et al. v. Gregory Wayne Abbott, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Wayne Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolando Pablos
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne M. Davis
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Flores
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of United Latin America Citizens of Texas
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford Levinson
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ramos
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ray
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Torres
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Velarde
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Williams
Represented By: Lisa L. Barclay
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Marco Kelly Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: James R. Martin
Represented By: Amy J. Mauser
Represented By: Amy L. Neuhardt
Represented By: Jack Allen Simms, Jr.
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Vissichelli
Represented By: Mary Melissa Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?