Lindberg et al v Adtalem Global Education, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Troy Lindberg, Dwayne Bolden, Claudia Acosta, Jeffery LaFayette, Joshua Thompson, Jose Jovel, Brandon Jordan, Ebony Ijeh, Stephanie Yell, David Corvin, Tarig Owens, David Gabriel Hardin, Diego Sanchez De Jarmy, Lee Nicholson, Kevin Guest, Whitney Burton, Barrie Bergans, Arkeiska Jefferson, Omer Qureshi, Shariq Mohammad, Kevin Lewis, Sr., Yumeka Gibson, April Wilson, Luis A. Lozano, Corey Kincaid, Bobby Garza, Khang Nguyen, Tamar Rockmore, Michelle Donahue, Teneika Latasha Tillis, Ruben Espinoza and Brad Booth
Defendant: DeVry University, Inc. and Adtalem Global Education, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00649
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Consolidating Case into 5:18cv82-DAE. ALL FILINGS MUST BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE 5:18CV82, DENYING #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #23 Stipulation filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Vacating Pretrial Conference and Trial Date. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION To Stay Discovery by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gonsalves, Terance)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Motions Hearing Set for 12/4/18 has Been VACATED. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) Modified docket text on 11/29/2018 (aej).
November 20, 2018 Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO TERM MOTION*** re #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (aej)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, ( Status Conference reset for 12/4/2018 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 Advisory to the Court by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance) Modified on 11/20/2018 to term Motion (aej).
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Troy Lindberg. (Fabry, John)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to inform the Court no later than November 20, 2018 of their position onwhether these cases should be consolidated or, if not consolidated, decided by the same Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej)
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 ADR Report Filed - Joint Rule CV-88 ADR Report by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.(Gonsalves, Terance)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR 11/28/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 10/31/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2019, Discovery due by 9/2/2019, Motions due by 10/16/2019,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Joint Fed. R. CIV. P. 26 Report by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 Scheduling Recommendations by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Troy Lindberg. (Fabry, John) Modified docket text on 9/25/2018 (aej).
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc., re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. (Gonsalves, Terance)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Troy Lindberg, re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Adtalem Global Education, Inc., Defendant DeVry University, Inc. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Fabry, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due September 27, 2018); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Adtalem Global Education, Inc., DeVry University, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Terance)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. Attorney Stephen K. Lecholop, II added to party Adtalem Global Education, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lecholop, Stephen)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order CONDITIONALLY GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. FURTHER, because this attorney has previously been admitted pro hac vice, the motion to appear pro hac vice is conditionally granted pending the attorney's application for admission. The attorney shall file for admission within 60 days and notify the Court when admitted. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bcg)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen K. Lecholop, II on behalf of Terance A. Gonzalves ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11074938) by on behalf of Adtalem Global Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lecholop, Stephen)
July 6, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Troy Lindberg as to All Defendants. (Fabry, John)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Troy Lindberg. (Fabry, John)
June 27, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
June 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10951944), filed by Troy Lindberg.(Fabry, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindberg et al v Adtalem Global Education, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Lindberg
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Bolden
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Acosta
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery LaFayette
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Thompson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jovel
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jordan
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Ijeh
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Yell
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Corvin
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarig Owens
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gabriel Hardin
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Sanchez De Jarmy
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Nicholson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Guest
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Burton
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrie Bergans
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkeiska Jefferson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omer Qureshi
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shariq Mohammad
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lewis, Sr.
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yumeka Gibson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Wilson
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Lozano
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Kincaid
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Garza
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khang Nguyen
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Rockmore
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Donahue
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teneika Latasha Tillis
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Espinoza
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Booth
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVry University, Inc.
Represented By: Terance A. Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adtalem Global Education, Inc.
Represented By: Terance A. Gonsalves
Represented By: Stephen K. Lecholop, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?