Roberts v. NIBCO, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blanca Roberts
Defendant: NIBCO, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00740
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant Nibo, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by NIBCO, Inc.. (Zinnecker, Ben) Modified docket text on 8/27/2018 (aej).
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Blanca Roberts. (Winter, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M. Winter on behalf of Blanca Roberts. Attorney John M. Winter added to party Blanca Roberts(pty:pla) (Winter, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal by NIBCO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Zinnecker, Ben)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NIBCO, Inc.. (Zinnecker, Ben)
July 18, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
July 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NIBCO, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11022035), filed by NIBCO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Zinnecker, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. NIBCO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Roberts
Represented By: Larry Moreno
Represented By: John M. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIBCO, Inc.
Represented By: Ben T. Zinnecker
Represented By: Missy Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?