Rodriguez, et al v. SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Rosaelia Benavidez, Ramon Rodriguez, Jesus Rodriguez, Jr and Jesus Rodriguez
Defendant: SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00741
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Joint Rule 26(F) Report by SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC (Proctor, Lori)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC. (Proctor, Lori)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC. (Proctor, Lori)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Rosaelia Benavidez, Ramon Rodriguez, Jesus Rodriguez, Jr. (Miller, Byron)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Rosaelia Benavidez, Ramon Rodriguez, Jesus Rodriguez, Jr. (Miller, Byron)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (dtg)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Erica Maloney (mgr)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to JS44 by SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC. (Proctor, Lori)
July 18, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
July 18, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SSC San Antonio West Operating Company LLC d/b/a Retama Manor Nursing Center / San Antonio West (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11023674), filed by SSC San Antonio West Operating Company LLC d/b/a Retama Manor Nursing Center / San Antonio West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Proctor, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez, et al v. SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosaelia Benavidez
Represented By: Byron B. Miller
Represented By: Michael D. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Rodriguez
Represented By: Byron B. Miller
Represented By: Michael D. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rodriguez, Jr
Represented By: Byron B. Miller
Represented By: Michael D. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rodriguez
Represented By: Byron B. Miller
Represented By: Michael D. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC San Antonio West Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Lori Diane Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?