Cleland Sales Corporation et al v. Schroeder Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cleland Sales Corporation and James Cleland
Defendant: Schroeder Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00856
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (wg)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Cleland Sales Corporation, James Cleland, Motions terminated: The Court further DISMISSES AS MOOT Plaintiffs Complaint for DeclaratoryJudgment (Dkt. # 1). The Clerk is INSTRUCTED to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Sealed Document by James Cleland, Cleland Sales Corporation. (Jasper, Jennifer)
September 10, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Taken under Advisement, separate Order shall be issued.Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2018 re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Cleland Sales Corporation, James Cleland (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(wg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 APPENDIX to #10 Response to Motion, by Schroeder Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Nash, William)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL, DOCUMENT MISSING COVER PAGE, NO ATTY. SIGNATURE OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. ***DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #11 Response to Motion, #13 Appendix (wg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, NO COVER PAGE, ATTY. SIGNATURE OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ***APPENDIX to #10 Response to Motion, by Schroeder Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nash, William) Modified on 9/10/2018 (wg).
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL, DOCUMENT SCANNED IMRPOPERLY, RE-FILE DOC. ***DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #11 Response to Motion, (wg)
September 8, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, DOCUMENT IMPROPERLY SCANNED, PLEASE REFILE DOC. ***RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Schroeder Industries, Inc., re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Cleland Sales Corporation, Plaintiff James Cleland (Corrected Declaration to Schroeders Supplemental Response) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nash, William) Modified on 9/10/2018 (wg).
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Schroeder Industries, Inc., re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Cleland Sales Corporation, Plaintiff James Cleland (Supplemental Response) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Declaration, #2 Supplement Exhibits to Supplemental Declaration)(Nash, William)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John van Loben Sels. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (at)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer D. Jasper for John van Loben Sels ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11184972) by on behalf of James Cleland, Cleland Sales Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jasper, Jennifer)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff's (wg)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Cleland Sales Corporation, James Cleland, ( Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2018 10:30 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Opposed Emergency Motion to Stay Arbitration, #2 Proposed Order) (Jasper, Jennifer)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Schroeder Industries, Inc., re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Cleland Sales Corporation, Plaintiff James Cleland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Nash, William)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENT to #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration by James Cleland, Cleland Sales Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jasper, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Notice to Attorney's : Exhibit #8 was Sealed Per Plaintiff's Counsel re #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay Arbitration. (wg)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Arbitration by James Cleland, Cleland Sales Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert D. Fish, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Sealed Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Jasper, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/22/2018 (wg).
August 17, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
August 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Cleland Sales Corporation. (Jasper, Jennifer)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11135919). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Cleland Sales Corporation, James Cleland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasper, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleland Sales Corporation et al v. Schroeder Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleland Sales Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer D. Jasper
Represented By: John D. van Loben Sels
Represented By: Jamil N. Alibhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cleland
Represented By: Jennifer D. Jasper
Represented By: John D. van Loben Sels
Represented By: Jamil N. Alibhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schroeder Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Lutzky
Represented By: Jason W. Whitney
Represented By: William B. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?