Fidelity National Title Insurance Company v. Parker

Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Counter Plaintiff: Andrew M. Parker
3Rd Party Defendant: Chris Fredericks, Tramaine Y. Scott, Jonathan J. Cunningham, Amy Miles, Gregory T. Brewer, Christina Johnson, Cale O'Brien, Sherry Finley, John M. Ledyard, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. and Shawn Heine
Case Number: 5:2018cv00936
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Vacation Letter by Andrew M. Parker (Arlitt, Kristine)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 DEFENDANT & COUNTER PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to #3 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #1 Notice of Removal, by Andrew M. Parker. (wg)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Striking Pleading 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Memorandum to the Court of Parkers Objection andResponse to Removal of Case to Federal Court, and, Notice to Court and Counter Defendants of Deficiency of Attempt to Remove Case (docket no. 4) is STRICKEN from the RECORD. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to JS44 Civil Cover Sheet by Gregory T. Brewer, Jonathan J. Cunningham, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Sherry Finley, Chris Fredericks, Shawn Heine, Christina Johnson, John M. Ledyard, Amy Miles, Cale O'brien, Tramaine Y. Scott. (Cunningham, Jonathan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Exhibits to Notice of Removal by Gregory T. Brewer, Jonathan J. Cunningham, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Sherry Finley, Chris Fredericks, Shawn Heine, Christina Johnson, John M. Ledyard, Amy Miles, Cale O'brien, Tramaine Y. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -- Answer to Amended Counterclaim)(Cunningham, Jonathan)
September 10, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
September 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11213510), filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix State Court Registry)(Cunningham, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Andrew M. Parker
Represented By: Kristine Arlitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chris Fredericks
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tramaine Y. Scott
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jonathan J. Cunningham
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Amy Miles
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gregory T. Brewer
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Christina Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cale O'Brien
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sherry Finley
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John M. Ledyard
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fidelity National Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Shawn Heine
Represented By: Jonathan Jay Cunningham
Represented By: Gregory Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?