Cameron Parker Properties, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Parker Properties, LLC
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, New Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 5:2018cv00942
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Cameron Parker Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The new deadline for Defendant to file a response brief is October 31, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/7/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 2/8/2019, Discovery due by 6/28/2019, Motions due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dtg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Danaher, Philip)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cameron Parker Properties, LLC. (Nichols, Justin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRED. Please do not re-file the entire document, please only file the Proposed Order as an Attachment and link it to the Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (mgr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRED*** MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cameron Parker Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Affidavit of Justin P. Nichols, #2 Exhibit 1-A: Bexar CAD Property Details, #3 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Adam B.J. Poole)(Nichols, Justin) Modified on 10/11/2018 (mgr).
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, re #5 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon (Danaher, Philip)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Cameron Parker Properties, LLC, re #5 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon (Nichols, Justin)
September 20, 2018 MOTION REFERRED: referred #5 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (rf)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #5 Motion to Vacate to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by The Bank of New York Mellon re #1 Notice of Removal, (Danaher, Philip)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Danaher, Philip)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
September 11, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11218084), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron Parker Properties, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Philip William Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Philip William Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Parker Properties, LLC
Represented By: Adam Bernard James Poole
Represented By: Justin P. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?