Hernandez v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff: Mary Jane Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Case Number: 5:2018cv00955
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
0 Judge: Henry J Bemporad
1 Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Hernandez. (aej)
October 23, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Hernandez. (aej)
October 23, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Hernandez. Commissioner Social Security served on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (aej)
September 17, 2018 6 Summons Issued with USM285 Forms as to Commissioner Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (aej)
September 17, 2018 5 COMPLAINT filed by Mary Jane Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aej)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
September 13, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad.. Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
September 13, 2018 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA (aej)
September 13, 2018 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Fallon Chermol on behalf of Mary Jane Hernandez (Chermol, David)
September 13, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Jane Hernandez. (Chermol, David)
September 13, 2018 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Jane Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Hernandez
Represented By: David Fallon Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?