Brestal v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Harold James Brestal
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Sunset Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00959
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Sunset Logistics, Inc.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
April 17, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sunset Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order)(Zachary, Whitley)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #25 Notice of ADR/Mediation Outcome. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Outcome: Settled during ADR/Mediation. Amount of fee: $1700. (Zachary, Whitley)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED ORDER re #23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davidoff, Bill)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Sunset Logistics, Inc. (aej)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sunset Logistics Inc.'s Designation of Experts by Sunset Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Zachary, Whitley)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Parties by Sunset Logistics, Inc.. (Zachary, Whitley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 Sunset Logistics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint of Plaintiff. Attorney Whitley B. Zachary added to party Sunset Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft) by Sunset Logistics, Inc..(Zachary, Whitley)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Designation of Experts by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Davidoff, Bill)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Sunset Logistics, Inc. (aej)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Harold James Brestal. (Humphreys, Mark)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Harold James Brestal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Humphreys, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support, filed by Harold James Brestal, re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Harold James Brestal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Humphreys, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Harold James Brestal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Mark)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, ( ADR Mediation Completed by 4/15/2019). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 ADR Report Filed - by Harold James Brestal and by Unum Life Insurance Company of America(Davidoff, Bill)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Harold James Brestal. (Humphreys, Mark)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/13/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2019, Discovery due by 3/14/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2019, Motions due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations by Plaintiff Harold James Brestal and by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Original ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Designation of Expert by Harold James Brestal (Humphreys, Mark)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Harold James Brestal. (Humphreys, Mark)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
September 14, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11229478), filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - List of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidoff, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brestal v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bill E. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Charlie J. Cilfone
Represented By: Whitley B. Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold James Brestal
Represented By: Mark Steven Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?