Rocha v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.

Plaintiff: Audrey Rocha
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00960
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al. answer due 11/17/2018. (aej)
October 29, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Prudential shall file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before November 17, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
October 26, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al. answer due 11/2/2018. (aej)
October 17, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Prudential shall file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before November 2, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
October 16, 2018 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
October 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al. answer due 10/19/2018. (aej)
October 9, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Prudential shall file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before October 19, 2018.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
October 4, 2018 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
September 26, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James C. Goodfellow. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 25, 2018 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Esteban Shardonofsky for James C. Goodfellow ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11266751) by on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
September 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al. answer due 10/5/2018. (aej)
September 18, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Prudential shall file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before October 5, 2018.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
September 17, 2018 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
September 14, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
September 14, 2018 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
September 14, 2018 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Shardonofsky, Esteban)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11229673), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Rocha
Represented By: Adam Poncio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.
Represented By: Esteban Shardonofsky
Represented By: James G. Goodfellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?