United States of America v. Rose Wells
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Rose Wells
Case Number: 5:2018cv00984
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Rose Wells answer due 1/20/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney for disposition of all pretrial matters. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rose Wells. (rg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 USM/285 & SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Rose Wells served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (wg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rose Wells. (rg)
September 21, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
September 21, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Giese, Erica)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giese, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rose Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Erica Benites Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?