Washington v. Biomet, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rose Washington
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC and Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01126
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Remark: Letter of Non-Admission to the WDTX/Forwarded to Attys: Erin Linder Hanig & John D. LaDue. (wg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Remark: Letter of Non-Admission to the WDTX/Forwarded to Atty: Joseph R. Riegerix. (wg)
October 26, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Indiana; Case Number 3:18-cv-00807.
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and by agreement of the parties, the court finds that proper venue lies in the Western District of Texas, and ORDERS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this case to that district. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/25/18. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. re #2 Order to Show Cause, of Joint Response to October 10, 2018 Order (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The parties are given until October 24, 2018 to show cause why this case should not be transferred to the Western District of Texas, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/10/18. (jld)(cc: Biomet Attorneys LaDue, Linder, Winter, Franco Busby, Campbell, Tanner, Russo) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3695430.), filed by Rose Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riegerix PHV, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Washington
Represented By: Joseph R Riegerix PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?