Maciel v. Alamo Home Source, LLC
Trustee: Mary K. Viegelahn and U.S. Trustee's Office
Appellee: Alamo Home Source, LLC
Appellant: Angelica Martinez Maciel
Case Number: 5:2018cv01136
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS APPEAL re #4 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Appeal Pending Before the District Court for the Western District of Texas as to Order Denying Confirmation and Dismissing Case filed by Angelica Martinez Maciel. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Appeal Pending Before the District Court for the Western District of Texas as to Order Denying Confirmation and Dismissing Case by Angelica Martinez Maciel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Malaise, J.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. Appellant's Designated Record on Appeal is COMPLETE. (Attachments: #1 Designation Document, #2 18-51333 Complete Docket Report, #3 Individual Designations 18-51333, #4 Proof of Claim No. 6, #5 Restricted Transcript 08.23.18 Hrg, #6 Restricted Transcript 09.27.18 Hrg, #7 16-51512 Complete Docket Report, #8 Individual Designations Case 16-51512) (Carouth, Christy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vanessa Inez DeLeon Guerrero on behalf of Mary K. Viegelahn. Attorney Vanessa Inez DeLeon Guerrero added to party Mary K. Viegelahn(pty:trust) (Guerrero, Vanessa)
October 30, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
October 30, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Denying and Dismissing Case, #3 Docket Report, #4 List of Parties) (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maciel v. Alamo Home Source, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mary K. Viegelahn
Represented By: Vanessa Inez DeLeon Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alamo Home Source, LLC
Represented By: William P. Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Angelica Martinez Maciel
Represented By: J. Todd Malaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?