Steve v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Troy Steve
Defendant: Orlando Gonzalez, Gonzalez Trucking Corporation, FCA US LLC and Gonzalez Trucking
Case Number: 5:2018cv01218
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Vacation Designation Request by Orlando Gonzalez, Gonzalez Trucking, Gonzalez Trucking Corporation (Siotos, Dean)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean J. Siotos on behalf of Orlando Gonzalez, Gonzalez Trucking, Gonzalez Trucking Corporation (Siotos, Dean)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter to (J. Kevin Kindred) as to Orlando Gonzalez, Gonzalez Trucking, Gonzalez Trucking Corporation. (wg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean J. Siotos on behalf of Orlando Gonzalez, Gonzalez Trucking, Gonzalez Trucking Corporation. Attorney Dean J. Siotos added to party Orlando Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Dean J. Siotos added to party Gonzalez Trucking(pty:dft), Attorney Dean J. Siotos added to party Gonzalez Trucking Corporation(pty:dft) (Siotos, Dean)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Troy Steve, re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Troy Steve (Midlo, Bennett)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by FCA US LLC, re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Troy Steve (Handy, Katherine)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Troy Steve. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Midlo, Bennett)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Order to Show Cause by Troy Steve. (Midlo, Bennett)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #3 Order to Show Cause by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Huntsman, Fred)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC. (Huntsman, Fred)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to FCA US LLC, Orlando Gonzalez, Gonzalez Trucking, Gonzalez Trucking Corporation, Troy Steve. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2018,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Atty: Michael J. Chapa. (wg)
November 21, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11482908), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Handy, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steve v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Gonzalez
Represented By: Dean J. Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez Trucking Corporation
Represented By: Dean J. Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Handy
Represented By: Fred Clayton Huntsman
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez Trucking
Represented By: Dean J. Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Steve
Represented By: Jason P. Hoelscher
Represented By: Bennett A. Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?