Doe v. Black et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Professional Performance Development Group, Inc., Donald L. Mooney Enterprises, LLC dba Nurses Etc Staffing and Matthew David Black
Case Number: 5:2018cv01226
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Professional Performance Development Group, Inc., re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Skarnulis, Steven)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Doe. (Maloney, Tim)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Professional Performance Development Group, Inc.. (Skarnulis, Steven)
November 26, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
November 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Professional Performance Development Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11487827), filed by Professional Performance Development Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Skarnulis, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Performance Development Group, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Bradley Skarnulis
Represented By: Benjamin David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L. Mooney Enterprises, LLC dba Nurses Etc Staffing
Represented By: Chris Andrew Scherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew David Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Tim Maloney
Represented By: Paul E. Campolo
Represented By: Eric Andrew Campolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?