White v. Cyr
Appellee: Steven Jeffrey Cyr
Appellant: Johnny Lee White, MD
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Case Number: 5:2018cv01287
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 2/11/2019. (rg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. Appellee's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal is Complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of the Record on Appeal (No. 40), #2 18-50102 Docket Sheet and Voluntary Petition, #3 18-5206 Individual Designations, #4 18-5206 Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. Appellant's Designation of the Record on Appeal is Complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of the Record on Appeal (No. 38), #2 18-50102 Docket Sheet and Voluntary Petition, #3 18-5206 Individual Designations, #4 18-5206 Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell Madden on behalf of Johnny Lee White, MD. Attorney Mitchell Madden added to party Johnny Lee White, MD(pty:a) (Madden, Mitchell)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to (Richard W. Ward) as to Johnny Lee White, MD. (wg)
December 7, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 List of Parties, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Order granting Motion, #4 Docket Sheet) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Cyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven Jeffrey Cyr
Represented By: Ronald J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Johnny Lee White, MD
Represented By: Richard W. Ward
Represented By: Mitchell Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?