MK Marlow Company, L.L.C. v. J.E. Dunn Construction Company, et al

Plaintiff: M.K. Marlow Company, Victoria, L.L.C.
Defendant: J. E. Dunn Construction Company, Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv01293
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 3/3/2019; Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer due 3/3/2019; J. E. Dunn Construction Company answer due 3/3/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 3/3/2019. (rg)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendants are granted a 30-day extension of the current deadlines to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdxr)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, J. E. Dunn Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defs' Unooposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Pltf's Original Complaint)(Riley, Travis)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Letter to attorney Gabriel S. Head. (rg)
January 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Federal Insurance Company answer due 2/3/2019; Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer due 2/3/2019; J. E. Dunn Construction Company answer due 2/3/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 2/3/2019. (rg)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendants J.E. Dunn Construction Company, Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, and Hartford Fire Insurance Company are granted a thirty (30) day extension of the current deadline in which they are required to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (md)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, J. E. Dunn Construction Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move or Plead in Response to Pltf's Original Complaint)(Riley, Travis)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.K. Marlow Company, Victoria, L.L.C.. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.K. Marlow Company, Victoria, L.L.C.. Federal Insurance Company served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.K. Marlow Company, Victoria, L.L.C.. Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.K. Marlow Company, Victoria, L.L.C.. J. E. Dunn Construction Company served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (rg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (rg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (rg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to J. E. Dunn Construction Company. (rg)
December 11, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
December 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MK Marlow Company, LLC. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MK Marlow Company, LLC. (Thompson, Bethany Faith)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11539760), filed by MK Marlow Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Payment Bond, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Bethany Faith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MK Marlow Company, L.L.C. v. J.E. Dunn Construction Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. E. Dunn Construction Company
Represented By: Travis K. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Travis K. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Travis K. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Travis K. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.K. Marlow Company, Victoria, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas J. Walthall, Jr.
Represented By: Bethany Faith Nelson Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?