Bartolome Jr. v. Berryhill

Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Petitioner: Cecilio Peralta Bartolome Jr and Cecilio Peralta Bartolome, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01333
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
January 31, 2019 Set Deadlines: Nancy A. Berryhill answer due 2/28/2019. (rg)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cecilio Peralta Bartolome, Jr. (Jacques, Andree)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE pending further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bc)
December 26, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cecilio Peralta Bartolome Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons)(Jacques, Andree)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11587504), filed by Cecilio Peralta Bartolome Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacques, Andree)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartolome Jr. v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cecilio Peralta Bartolome Jr
Represented By: Andree Renee Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cecilio Peralta Bartolome, Jr.
Represented By: Andree Renee Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?