Hernandez v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Ramon Hernandez
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Schlumberger Group Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00022
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
0 Judge: Fred Biery
1 Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit a proposed scheduling orderpursuant to Local Rule CV-16(c), no later than April 22, 2019.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney for pretrial proceedings including any requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Sales, Travis)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Travis J. Sales added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft), Attorney Travis J. Sales added to party Schlumberger Group Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America, Schlumberger Group Welfare Benefits Plan.(Sales, Travis)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
January 10, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Ramon Hernandez. (Whitehead, Marc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ramon Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Whitehead, Marc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11633579), filed by Ramon Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehead, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Travis J. Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Group Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Travis J. Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Hernandez
Represented By: Marc S. Whitehead
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Represented By: J. Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?