Hull v. Whitaker et al
Plaintiff: John Christopher Hull
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker and Ken Paxton
Petitioner: Stanley Dawidowiez, Christina Leann Nunn, Sharla Wilton, Rebecca S. Pierson, Robin Rae Kelly, Jacqueline A. Schneider, Jessica Nicole Thompson, Marshall L. Eldridge, Cindy Colbert-Hock, Stephanie Lobignat, Mitchel Dane Cameron, Karin Tang, Mark Agro, Douglas W. McLaughlin, Rhonda T. Favero, Kathy Spain, Pamela Molnar, Lawrence L. Favero, Jeffrey F. Knirk, Sr., Douglas Leigh Hughes, Patricia Y. Yost, Gail F. McLaughlin, Kristi Becker, Jeffrey A. Thorson, Debbie Bertolins, Kevin J. Tank and Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Case Number: 5:2019cv00026
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 41 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 40 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Douglas Leigh Hughes.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 39 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Stanley Dawidowiez.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 38 Pro Se MOTION to Join by Karin Tang.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
February 28, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ken Paxton, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Ken Paxton (Graydon, Scot)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Christopher Hull. Ken Paxton served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Christopher Hull. Matthew G. Whitaker served on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/19/2019 (mgr) Modified on 2/25/2019, to edit text (mgr).
February 21, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by John Christopher Hull, re #27 MOTION filed by Defendant Ken Paxton (mgr) (Main Document 32 replaced on 2/22/2019) (mgr).
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Mark Agro.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Robin Rae Kelly.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Pamela Molnar.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion. The Court will apply the opposition as articulated in Defendants' advisory, as well as in their pending motion to dismiss, to the motions to join currently on file and to any such motions filed in the future. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
February 13, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO READ AS FOLLOWS***re #27 MOTION regarding Motions to Join. (rf)
February 13, 2019 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT THIS IS A MOTION**** re #27 MOTION to Join. (rf)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Patricia Y. Yost.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION regarding Motion to Join by Ken Paxton. (Graydon, Scot) Modified on 2/13/2019 , to add relief and edit text(rf).
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Gail F. McLaughlin.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Jeffrey A. Thorson.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 24 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Douglas W. McLaughlin.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Rebecca S. Pierson.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Jacqueline A. Schneider.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Douglas Leigh Hughes.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Karen Diann Davis Hughes.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Debbie Bertolins.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Kevin J. Tank.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 PRO-SE MOTION to Join by Jessica Nicole Thompson.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 4, 2019 Notice of Correction: Case stayed in Error, Please Disregard Flag, ONLY DISCOVERY IS STAYED IN THIS CASE ***PENDING ORDER BY THE COURT **8re Set/Clear Flags, Case Stayed. (wg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Jeffrey F. Knirk, Sr.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
February 1, 2019 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, ONLY DISCOVERY IS STAYED, FLAG REMOVED **Case Stayed/Pending Further Order by the Court (wg) Modified on 2/4/2019 (wg).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Stay. All discovery in this case is stayed until further order of the Court. The parties are also excused from conducting their Rule 26(f) conference until otherwise ordered. The Court notes that the federal Defendants have yet to be served. Plaintiff is reminded that it is his obligation to timely serve all Defendants with a copy of his complaint in compliance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), he must do so within 90 days from the date he filed his complaint or his claims against the unserved Defendants may be dismissed without prejudice. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Cindy Colbert-Hock.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Graydon, Scot)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Ken Paxton.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Graydon, Scot)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Stephanie Lobignat.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 PRO-SE MOTION to Join filed by Sharla Wilton.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Lawrence L. Favero.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Marshall L. Eldridge.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Christina Leann Nunn.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION to Join by Rhonda T. Favero.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 PRO-SE MOTION to Join law Suit filed by Mitchel Dane Cameron. (wg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 PRO-SE MOTION to Join Law Suit filed by Kathy Spain. (wg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRO-SE MOTION to Join Law Suit filed by Kristi Becker. (wg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ken Paxton, Matthew G. Whitaker. (fs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 500047548), filed by John Christopher Hull. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt Copy)(fs)
January 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (fs)
January 11, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (fs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Christopher Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Scot M. Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Dawidowiez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christina Leann Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sharla Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rebecca S. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robin Rae Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacqueline A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Nicole Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marshall L. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cindy Colbert-Hock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephanie Lobignat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mitchel Dane Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karin Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Agro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas W. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathy Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Molnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey F. Knirk, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Leigh Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patricia Y. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail F. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristi Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey A. Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Debbie Bertolins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin J. Tank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?