United States of America v. $29,800.00, More or Less, in United States Currency et al
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: $70,000.00, More or Less, in United States Currency in Safe Deposit Box #K89, Frost Bank and $29,800.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Case Number: 5:2019cv00054
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Declaration of Publication by United States of America (Esparza, Fidel)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT for Arrest of Property Returned to Humberto Saldana, Attorney for Sue Wing Ng a/k/a William Ng by United States of America (Esparza, Fidel) Modified on 2/6/2019 (rg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT for Arrest of Property Returned to Sue Wing Ng a/k/a William Ng by United States of America (Esparza, Fidel) Modified on 2/6/2019 (rg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for Arrest of Property Returned to Fai Kan Lew a/k/a Fai Ng by United States of America (Esparza, Fidel) Modified on 2/6/2019 (rg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT for Arrest of Property Returned to Jianghua Fu by United States of America (Esparza, Fidel) Modified on 2/6/2019 (rg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT for Arrest of Property Returned as to Shee King Ng by United States of America (Esparza, Fidel) Modified on 2/6/2019 (rg).
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant for Arrest of Property Issued for $29,800.00, More or Less, in United States Currency, and $70,000.00, more or less in United States Currency in safe deposit box #K89, Frost Bank (rg)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Order for Warrant of Arrest of Property, #2 Warrant for the Arrest of Property, #3 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtg)
January 18, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (dtg)
January 18, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $29,800.00, More or Less, in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Fidel Esparza, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: $70,000.00, More or Less, in United States Currency in Safe Deposit Box #K89, Frost Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: $29,800.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?