Alton v. SeaQuest Management, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alui Alton
Defendant: SeaQuest Interactive Aquarium Fort Worth LLC and SeaQuest Management, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00070
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2020 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/30/2019, ADR Mediation Completed by 10/18/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2019, Discovery due by 8/19/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 6/7/2019, Motions due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by SeaQuest Interactive Aquarium Fort Worth LLC, SeaQuest Management, Inc. (Galo, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by SeaQuest Interactive Aquarium Fort Worth LLC, SeaQuest Management, Inc. (Galo, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
January 28, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SeaQuest Interactive Aquarium Fort Worth LLC, SeaQuest Management, Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11690168), filed by SeaQuest Interactive Aquarium Fort Worth LLC, SeaQuest Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Galo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alton v. SeaQuest Management, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alui Alton
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Kemmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaQuest Interactive Aquarium Fort Worth LLC
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaQuest Management, Inc
Represented By: Michael V. Galo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?