UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Wilson
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Darrell Antonio Wilson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00076
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Christilles, Jacquelyn)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Jon R. Disrud added to party Darrell Antonio Wilson(pty:dft) by Darrell Antonio Wilson.(Disrud, Jon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Darrell Antonio Wilson served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (mgr)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Darrell Antonio Wilson. (wg)
January 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
January 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Christilles, Jacquelyn)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Christilles, Jacquelyn) Modified filing fee text on 2/15/2019 (wg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Antonio Wilson
Represented By: Jon R. Disrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jacquelyn Michelle Christilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?