Trevino v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Ernest C. Trevino
Defendant: JR Gallegos, Albert Lopez, Robert Leonhardt, Andres Aguirre, Robert Earl Wood, Kenneth Hernandez, Robert "Bobby" Maldonado, Diana Prasifika, Britni Van Curan, Travis Hall, Jr., Audrey Gossett Louis and Johnny Huizar
Case Number: 5:2019cv00099
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
0 Judge: Henry J Bemporad
1 Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Ernest C. Trevino. (aej)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause by Ernest C. Trevino. Modified to term motion on 3/11/2019 (aej). Modified on 3/22/2019 (aej).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Ernest C. Trevino. GRANTING #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ernest C. Trevino and #2 MOTION Request to File Electronically filed by Ernest C. Trevino. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Albert Lopez on behalf of Albert Lopez. Attorney Albert Lopez added to party Albert Lopez(pty:dft) (Lopez, Albert)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request to File Electronically by Ernest C. Trevino. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ernest C. Trevino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg)
February 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg)
February 4, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevino v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Lopez
Represented By: Albert Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Leonhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Earl Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert "Bobby" Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Prasifika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britni Van Curan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Gossett Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Huizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest C. Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?