Rodriguez v. Avalos et al

Plaintiff: Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez
Defendant: Eric Avalos and Cortney Rico
Case Number: 5:2019cv00114
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Eric Avalos, Cortney Rico. (rg)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Eric Avalos, Eric Avalos d/b/a Chavalos Music, Inc., and Cortney Rico by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Miguel Villarreal, Jr., #2 Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment & Injunction)(Villarreal, Miguel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default against Eric Avalos, Eric Avalos d/b/a Chavalos Music, Inc., and Cortney Rico by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Miguel Villarreal, Jr., #2 Proposed Order Default by Clerk)(Villarreal, Miguel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Vacation Letter by attorney Miguel Villarreal, Jr. (rg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Vacation Notice (M. Villarreal) by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez (Villarreal, Miguel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez. Eric Avalos served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Villarreal, Miguel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez. Cortney Rico served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Villarreal, Miguel)
February 8, 2019 Received 2 CD's of Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (forward 1 CD to Judge Rodriguez Chambers) (rg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (bc)
February 8, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
February 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez. (Villarreal, Miguel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11742686), filed by Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - CD, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Registration, #4 Exhibit C - Copyright Application, #5 Exhibit D - C&D Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Avalos Response)(Villarreal, Miguel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Avalos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Avalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortney Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Lucy Rodriguez
Represented By: Brandon Taylor Cook
Represented By: Miguel Villarreal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?