Lamonica v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Stephen A. Lamonica
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00152
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Plaintiff Stephen A. Lamonica Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (Valdez, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Order Recommendations by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 Show Cause Order, filed by Stephen A. Lamonica, MOTION for extension of time to file a response to the re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Wilson, Mary) Modified on 4/9/2019 (rg).
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #11 Notice of Appearance (mgr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT -MISSING CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Irwin Wilson on behalf of Stephen A. Lamonica (Wilson, Mary) Modified on 4/2/2019 (mgr).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Stephen A. Lamonica.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Stephen A. Lamonica. (Wilson, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule 9(b) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Valdez, Robert)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mary Ann Notestine. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose J. Trevino, Jr Motion for Admission for Pro Hac Vice (Mary Ann Notestine) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11786549) by on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposd Order)(Trevino, Jose)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney James M. Shaw. (mgr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Mary Ann Notestine. (mgr)
February 19, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11774613), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement to JS44, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamonica v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Lamonica
Represented By: Mary Irwin Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Represented By: Mary Ann Notestine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?