Hill Country Holdings, LLC d/b/a Ashley Furniture v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Plaintiff: Hill Country Holdings, LLC d/b/a Ashley Furniture and Hill Country Holdings, LLC
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00158
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/23/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (aej)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jamie Adele McGonigal ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11795887) by on behalf of Hill Country Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (McGonigal, Jamie)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter (Jon C. Rice)as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (wg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter (Mark M. Bell) as to Hill Country Holdings, LLC. (wg)
February 19, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11780199), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service, #3 Exhibit C - Original Answer, #4 Exhibit D - State Action Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Danford, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill Country Holdings, LLC d/b/a Ashley Furniture v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Country Holdings, LLC d/b/a Ashley Furniture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Country Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark M. Bell
Represented By: Jamie Adele McGonigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?