McKee v. Roberts Family Homes, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Kevin J. McKee
Defendant: Roberts Family Homes, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00161
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Roberts Family Homes, LLC. (Rapp, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper (Klepper, Gabrielle)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Kevin J. McKee. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff. Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party Roberts Family Homes, LLC(pty:dft) by Roberts Family Homes, LLC.(Rapp, Robert)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin J. McKee. Roberts Family Homes, LLC served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Roberts Family Homes, LLC. (bc)
February 20, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
February 20, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kevin McKee. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11782974), filed by Kevin McKee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Klepper, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. Roberts Family Homes, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. McKee
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Family Homes, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?