Espinoza v. Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio
Plaintiff: Nicholas Espinoza
Defendant: Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio
Case Number: 5:2019cv00167
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Non-ConsentConcerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by Nicholas Espinoza (Richard, Dennis) Modified on 4/12/2019 (wg).
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (McElroy, Donna)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Defs Answer to Plts Original Petition) by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio.(McElroy, Donna)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(McElroy, Donna)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within 45 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Nicholas Espinoza, re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Complainant's Right to File Civil Action, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, Jury Demand, and Request for Disclosures)(Richard, Dennis)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(B)(6) by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(McElroy, Donna)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (McElroy, Donna)
February 21, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
February 21, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, (Defendant's Certificate of Filing in State Court-Notice of Removal) by Donna K. McElroy on behalf of Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH 1 -- State Court Ntc. of Filing)(McElroy, Donna)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11791584), filed by Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A -- State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civ. Cvr. Sheet)(McElroy, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boys and Girls Clubs of San Antonio
Represented By: Donna K. McElroy
Represented By: Elisa B. Reinsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Espinoza
Represented By: Dennis L. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?