Gabriela Vega v. Tessco Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gabriela Vega
Defendant: Tessco Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00174
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A. McNitzky on behalf of Tessco Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Mark A. McNitzky added to party Tessco Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (McNitzky, Mark)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Tessco Technologies, Inc.. (de Leon, Lara)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Setting Status Conference and Hearing on All Pending Motions for 4/24/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Tessco Technologies, Inc.. (de Leon, Lara)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/23/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2019, Discovery due by 11/15/2019, Motions due by 1/29/2020,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Recommendations JOINT by Tessco Technologies, Inc. and Gabriela Vega (de Leon, Lara) Modified on 3/26/2019 (rg).
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tessco Technologies, Inc.. (de Leon, Lara)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due March 25, 2019); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw)
February 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tessco Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11797031), filed by Tessco Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(de Leon, Lara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriela Vega v. Tessco Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessco Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Lara Cardin de Leon
Represented By: Mark A. McNitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Vega
Represented By: Dennis L. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?